Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 373 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3964 Week
» 14099 Month
» 330330 Year
» 841432 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4834   19/06/1939
LNER (1946 1st) 763   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 863   22/11/1946
BR 60863   04/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Sat 19/06/1939 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 28/04/1962 off Leicester (G.C.) (15E)
Scrapping Wed 09/05/1962 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 22 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington Works for cutting up 9/5/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 19/06/1939
NWE New England 24/10/1946
38E Woodford Halse 04/03/1951
38C Leicester (G.C.) 17/05/1953
35B Grantham 16/05/1957
38C Leicester (G.C.) 15/09/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 28/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 38C Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 35B Grantham 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 38C Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 05/10/1957
LOAN 15E Leicester (G.C.) 01/02/1958
ALLOC 15E Leicester (G.C.) 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 28/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
19/06/1939 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3032)
01/06/1946 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2928)
21/05/1947 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3089)
21/05/1947 Modified pony truck
04/03/1949 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2959)
23/02/1951 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29352)
27/03/1953 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29350)
09/06/1955 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29432)
08/03/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29404)
15/09/1959 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29544)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 01/08/1939 05/08/1939 5 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 21/12/1940 25/01/1941 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 26/09/1942 31/10/1942 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/06/1944 15/07/1944 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 13/04/1946 01/06/1946 50 days General
Boiler number 2928 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 29/03/1947 21/05/1947 54 days General
Boiler number 29359 (Diagram 109)
Modified pony truck
 
Doncaster Works 01/02/1949 04/03/1949 32 days General
Boiler number 2959 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60863
 
Doncaster Works 23/01/1951 23/02/1951 32 days General
Boiler number 29352 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 02/03/1953 27/03/1953 26 days General
Boiler number 29350 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 04/05/1955 09/06/1955 37 days General
Boiler number 29432 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 31/01/1957 08/03/1957 37 days General
Boiler number 29404 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 13/08/1959 15/09/1959 34 days General
Boiler number 29544 (Diagram 109)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/06/1939 To Service To service as LNER Number 4834
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
01/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/08/1939. Dep: 05/08/1939.    
21/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1940. Dep: 25/01/1941.    
26/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1942. Dep: 31/10/1942.    
10/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1944. Dep: 15/07/1944.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 763 but not taken up    
13/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2928 (Diagram 109)
   
24/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
22/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 863    
29/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1947. Dep: 21/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29359 (Diagram 109)
Modified pony truck
   
01/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1949. Dep: 04/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2959 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60863
   
23/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1951. Dep: 23/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29352 (Diagram 109)
   
04/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
02/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1953. Dep: 27/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29350 (Diagram 109)
   
17/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C)    
04/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1955. Dep: 09/06/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29432 (Diagram 109)
   
31/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1957. Dep: 08/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29404 (Diagram 109)
   
16/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
15/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C)    
13/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1959. Dep: 15/09/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29544 (Diagram 109)
   
28/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 60863 from Leicester (G.C.) (15E)    
09/05/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev