Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 372 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3963 Week
» 14098 Month
» 330329 Year
» 841431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4831   26/05/1939
LNER (1946 1st) 760   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 860   18/07/1946
BR (Tmp) E860   28/02/1948
BR 60860   12/11/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
15/06/1939 DURHAM SCHOOL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 26/05/1939 to Gateshead (GHD)
Withdrawal Mon 22/10/1962 off Heaton (52B)
Scrapping Thu 24/01/1963 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 23 yrs, 4 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington Works for cutting-up 24/1/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GHD Gateshead (New) 26/05/1939
HTN Heaton 30/09/1939
GHD Gateshead 28/03/1943
HTN Heaton 06/02/1949
52A Gateshead 01/07/1951
52B Heaton 09/09/1951
52D Tweedmouth 12/04/1953
52A Gateshead 16/06/1957
52B Heaton 03/01/1960
   Withdrawn 22/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 52A Gateshead w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 52B Heaton w/e 15/09/1951
ALLOC 52D Tweedmouth 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   w/e 22/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
26/05/1939 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3026)
27/12/1940 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2898)
11/07/1942 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2894)
08/07/1944 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3472)
28/02/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3461)
24/12/1949 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2897)
15/11/1951 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29513)
18/06/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29471)
14/11/1956 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29504)
20/06/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
30/10/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29372)
19/02/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
31/08/1960 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29462)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 06/06/1939 13/06/1939 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 26/07/1939 28/07/1939 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 18/11/1940 27/12/1940 40 days General
Boiler number 2898 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 30/12/1940 08/01/1941 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 06/06/1942 11/07/1942 36 days General
Boiler number 2894 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 18/05/1944 08/07/1944 52 days General
Boiler number 3472 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 15/06/1946 20/07/1946 36 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 860
 
Doncaster Works 28/01/1948 28/02/1948 32 days General
Boiler number 3461 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E860
 
Doncaster Works 17/12/1948 08/01/1949 23 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 21/11/1949 24/12/1949 34 days General
Boiler number 2897 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 12/10/1951 15/11/1951 35 days General
Boiler number 29513 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 08/07/1952 16/09/1952 71 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 20/09/1952 04/10/1952 15 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 18/05/1954 18/06/1954 32 days General
Boiler number 3044 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 10/08/1954 14/08/1954 5 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 11/10/1956 14/11/1956 35 days General
Boiler number 29504 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 02/04/1958 02/04/1958 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 10/06/1958 20/06/1958 11 days Unclassified
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 26/09/1958 30/10/1958 35 days General
Boiler number 29372 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 16/02/1959 19/02/1959 4 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 25/07/1960 31/08/1960 38 days General
Boiler number 29462 (Diagram 109)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/05/1939 To Service To service as LNER Number 4831
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gateshead (GHD)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
06/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/06/1939. Dep: 13/06/1939.    
15/06/1939 Naming Named 'DURHAM SCHOOL'    
26/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/07/1939. Dep: 28/07/1939.    
30/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
18/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1940. Dep: 27/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2898 (Diagram 109)
   
30/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/12/1940. Dep: 08/01/1941.    
06/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1942. Dep: 11/07/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2894 (Diagram 109)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
18/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1944. Dep: 08/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3472 (Diagram 109)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 760 but not taken up    
15/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1946. Dep: 20/07/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 860
   
28/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1948. Dep: 28/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3461 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E860
   
12/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 60860    
17/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/12/1948. Dep: 08/01/1949.    
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
21/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1949. Dep: 24/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2897 (Diagram 109)
   
01/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
09/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
12/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1951. Dep: 15/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29513 (Diagram 109)
   
08/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/07/1952. Dep: 16/09/1952.    
20/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/09/1952. Dep: 04/10/1952.    
12/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D)    
18/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1954. Dep: 18/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3044 (Diagram 109)
   
10/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/08/1954. Dep: 14/08/1954.    
11/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1956. Dep: 14/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29504 (Diagram 109)
   
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
02/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 02/04/1958. Dep: 02/04/1958.    
10/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/06/1958. Dep: 20/06/1958.
Work undertaken:
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
26/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1958. Dep: 30/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29372 (Diagram 109)
   
16/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/02/1959. Dep: 19/02/1959.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
03/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
25/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1960. Dep: 31/08/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29462 (Diagram 109)
   
22/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 60860 from Heaton (52B)    
24/01/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev