Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 371 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3962 Week
» 14097 Month
» 330328 Year
» 841430 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4830   18/05/1939
LNER (1946 1st) 759   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 859   07/11/1946
BR 60859   11/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 18/05/1939 to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)
Withdrawal Mon 20/09/1965 off Gateshead (52A)
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell)
Service Life 26 yrs, 4 mths , 2 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Ellis Metals, Swalwell, 10/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LEI Leicester (G.C.) (New) 18/05/1939
NEA Neasden 16/12/1939
GOR Gorton 01/06/1942
DON Doncaster 19/07/1943
NWE New England 24/12/1944
38E Woodford Halse 11/02/1951
37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 03/01/1954
51L Thornaby 11/09/1960
52A Gateshead 05/07/1964
   Withdrawn 20/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse w/e 11/02/1951
ALLOC 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 23/01/1954
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 5w/e 08/08/1964
WDN   w/e 20/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
18/05/1939 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3024)
11/08/1945 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2923)
11/02/1949 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3045)
07/02/1951 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29433)
28/04/1953 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29361)
26/08/1955 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29358)
09/11/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29437)
28/04/1958 Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
06/05/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
28/10/1961 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29431)
28/10/1961 Smith speedometer fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 20/07/1939 22/07/1939 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 01/06/1940 08/06/1940 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 28/03/1942 09/05/1942 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 02/10/1943 30/10/1943 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/06/1945 11/08/1945 50 days General
Boiler number 2923 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 01/01/1947 25/01/1947 25 days General  
Doncaster Works 13/01/1949 11/02/1949 30 days General
Boiler number 3045 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60859
 
Doncaster Works 09/01/1951 07/02/1951 30 days General
Boiler number 29433 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 24/09/1951 04/10/1951 11 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 13/02/1952 04/03/1952 21 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 24/03/1953 28/04/1953 36 days General
Boiler number 3085 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 25/07/1955 26/08/1955 33 days General
Boiler number 29358 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 09/10/1957 09/11/1957 32 days General
Boiler number 29437 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 08/02/1958 28/04/1958 80 days Heavy Casual
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
 
Darlington Works 04/05/1959 06/05/1959 3 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 02/10/1961 28/10/1961 27 days General
Boiler number 29431 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
 
Darlington Works 03/11/1961 16/11/1961 14 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/05/1939 To Service To service as LNER Number 4830
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
20/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/07/1939. Dep: 22/07/1939.    
16/12/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
01/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/06/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940.    
28/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1942. Dep: 09/05/1942.    
01/06/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
19/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
02/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1943. Dep: 30/10/1943.    
24/12/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
23/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1945. Dep: 11/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2923 (Diagram 109)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 759 but not taken up    
07/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 859    
01/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1947. Dep: 25/01/1947.    
13/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1949. Dep: 11/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3045 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60859
   
09/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1951. Dep: 07/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29433 (Diagram 109)
   
11/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
24/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/09/1951. Dep: 04/10/1951.    
13/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/02/1952. Dep: 04/03/1952.    
24/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1953. Dep: 28/04/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3085 (Diagram 109)
   
03/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B)    
25/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1955. Dep: 26/08/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29358 (Diagram 109)
   
09/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1957. Dep: 09/11/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29437 (Diagram 109)
   
08/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/02/1958. Dep: 28/04/1958.
Work undertaken:
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
   
04/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/05/1959. Dep: 06/05/1959.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
11/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
02/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1961. Dep: 28/10/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29431 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
   
03/11/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1961. Dep: 16/11/1961.    
11/11/1961 Sightings Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
05/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
20/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 60859 from Gateshead (52A)    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Ellis Metals: Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell    

prev prev