|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1941 | 19/04/1941 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1943 | 17/07/1943 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/04/1945 | 09/06/1945 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2899 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1945 | 21/07/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1947 | 24/03/1947 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/06/1949 | 13/07/1949 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29366 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60858 |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1951 | 10/07/1951 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1952 | 21/03/1952 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1954 | 08/02/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29398 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1955 | 05/08/1955 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1956 | 05/10/1956 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 29405 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/10/1956 | 03/11/1956 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1957 | 11/01/1957 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1957 | 09/02/1957 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1958 | 23/05/1958 | 33 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 29346 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1959 | 06/04/1959 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 15/09/1961 | 14/10/1961 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29359 (Diagram 109) Double Chimney fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/05/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4829 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1799 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
20/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
08/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1941. Dep: 19/04/1941. | ||
12/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1943. Dep: 17/07/1943. | ||
21/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1945. Dep: 09/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2899 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/07/1945. Dep: 21/07/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 758 but not taken up | ||
21/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 858 | ||
20/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1947. Dep: 24/03/1947. | ||
01/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1949. Dep: 13/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29366 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60858 |
||
05/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/06/1951. Dep: 10/07/1951. | ||
11/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/03/1952. Dep: 21/03/1952. | ||
18/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
04/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1954. Dep: 08/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29398 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/07/1955. Dep: 05/08/1955. | ||
07/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1956. Dep: 05/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29405 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/10/1956. Dep: 03/11/1956. | ||
07/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/01/1957. Dep: 11/01/1957. | ||
01/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/02/1957. Dep: 09/02/1957. | ||
21/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 21/04/1958. Dep: 23/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29346 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/02/1959. Dep: 06/04/1959. Work undertaken: Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
15/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1961. Dep: 14/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29359 (Diagram 109) Double Chimney fitted |
||
29/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
06/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60858 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
10/01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |