Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 372 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3963 Week
» 14098 Month
» 330329 Year
» 841431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4825   19/04/1939
LNER (1946 1st) 754   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 854   25/10/1946
BR 60854   25/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Sun 19/04/1939 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Sun 16/06/1963 off New England (34E)
Scrapping Wed 02/10/1963 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 24 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster Works for cutting up 2/10/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) 19/04/1939
35B Grantham 16/06/1957
38C Leicester (G.C.) 15/09/1957
34A Kings Cross 11/03/1958
34F Grantham 07/05/1961
34A Kings Cross 11/06/1961
34E New England 21/04/1963
   Withdrawn 16/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 35B Grantham 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 38C Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 05/10/1957
LOAN 15E Leicester (G.C.) 01/02/1958
ALLOC 15E Leicester (G.C.) 23/02/1958
LOAN 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 28/03/1958
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 34F Grantham 5w/e 13/05/1961
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 34E New England 3w/e 27/04/1963
WDN   16/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
19/04/1939 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3014)
18/11/1944 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2933)
27/09/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3332)
29/10/1952 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29418)
15/10/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29342)
01/02/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29385)
16/04/1959 Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 22/07/1939 29/07/1939 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 08/03/1941 12/04/1941 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/12/1942 09/01/1943 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 07/10/1944 18/11/1944 43 days General
Boiler number 2933 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 05/10/1946 26/10/1946 22 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 854
 
Doncaster Works 18/08/1948 27/09/1948 41 days General
Boiler number 29347 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60854
 
Doncaster Works 16/11/1950 20/12/1950 35 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 23/09/1952 29/10/1952 37 days General
Boiler number 29418 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 01/12/1952 04/12/1952 4 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 10/08/1953 20/08/1953 11 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 13/09/1954 15/10/1954 33 days General
Boiler number 29342 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 20/10/1955 16/12/1955 58 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 29/12/1956 01/02/1957 35 days General
Boiler number 29385 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 15/01/1958 11/03/1958 56 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Darlington Works 09/03/1959 16/04/1959 39 days Heavy Intermediate
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
 
Doncaster Works 14/12/1961 25/01/1962 43 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/04/1939 To Service To service as LNER Number 4825
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
22/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/07/1939. Dep: 29/07/1939.    
08/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1941. Dep: 12/04/1941.    
05/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1942. Dep: 09/01/1943.    
07/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1944. Dep: 18/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2933 (Diagram 109)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 754 but not taken up    
05/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 854
   
18/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1948. Dep: 27/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29347 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60854
   
16/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/11/1950. Dep: 20/12/1950.    
23/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1952. Dep: 29/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29418 (Diagram 109)
   
01/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/12/1952. Dep: 04/12/1952.    
10/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/08/1953. Dep: 20/08/1953.    
13/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1954. Dep: 15/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29342 (Diagram 109)
   
20/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/10/1955. Dep: 16/12/1955.    
29/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1956. Dep: 01/02/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29385 (Diagram 109)
   
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
15/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C)    
15/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/01/1958. Dep: 11/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
11/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
09/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/03/1959. Dep: 16/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
   
07/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (34F)    
11/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
14/12/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1961. Dep: 25/01/1962.    
21/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
16/06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 60854 from New England (34E)    
02/10/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev