|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1939 | 29/07/1939 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1941 | 12/04/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1942 | 09/01/1943 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/10/1944 | 18/11/1944 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2933 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1946 | 26/10/1946 | 22 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 854 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1948 | 27/09/1948 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29347 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60854 |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/11/1950 | 20/12/1950 | 35 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1952 | 29/10/1952 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29418 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1952 | 04/12/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1953 | 20/08/1953 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/09/1954 | 15/10/1954 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29342 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1955 | 16/12/1955 | 58 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 29/12/1956 | 01/02/1957 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29385 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1958 | 11/03/1958 | 56 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1959 | 16/04/1959 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/12/1961 | 25/01/1962 | 43 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/04/1946 | Midland Section | 4825 has been fitted with a self-cleaning smoke-box (15/4). 2683 (26A) was noted at Wellingborough, running light, on 20/3. An interesting working for which Bedford shed is responsible is a trip to Gloucester. The route is via Northampton and Stratford, and the locomotive, usually a 3F, is due out at 3 a.m, and does not re-turn until late at night. | SLS/194605 |
24/11/1945 | Willesden | No. 28786, one of the last survivors of the L.N.W. 19in. goods worked a goods train from Willesden on 24/11/45. This is the first known appearance of one of these engines in London for many years. | SLS/194605 |
31/10/1957 | Leicester (G.C.) MPD | This shed is expected to close and the work shared between Neasden and Darnall (41A). At start of winter time tables the A3's (60049/102/4/6/7/11) were exchanged for V2's 60831/42/54/63/911. This leaves no A3's on the G.C. at all. A5 69800 has replaced L1 67786. | SLS/195711 |
13/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3453, E3088-94. Outside Erecting Shop: 60817, 61375, 61861/99, 63858, 68900, 70003/7. Erecting Shop: D2406, D3289, 13336, D3487, D5522/47/95, D5822. D8021, 08213, D9012, 12133, 43032, 60025/47/61/87, 60134, 60854, 61051, 61223/52, 61374, 62013, 63924/38, 70006, 76046. Stripping Road-dept. 10/1: 60938, 62034, 63571. Outside Crimpsal: D3482. 70018. Crimpsal: 60014/43/63/83/97. Outside Weighshop: 60138/57. Paint Shop: D374 (BE 3120 VF D670 of 1961), D5369 (BRCW DEL 212 of 1961), D5644, D5828 (Brush 364 of 1961), D5830 (Brush 366 of 1961), E3086/7, 60027/84 an 60125. | SLS/196202 |
28/01/1962 | Doncaster MPD | Ex-Works on 36A Shed: D2406, D3474, D4082 (new ex-Darlington), 60854, 61051. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/04/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4825 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1795 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
22/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/07/1939. Dep: 29/07/1939. | ||
08/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1941. Dep: 12/04/1941. | ||
05/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1942. Dep: 09/01/1943. | ||
07/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1944. Dep: 18/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2933 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 754 but not taken up | ||
05/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 854 |
||
18/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1948. Dep: 27/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29347 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60854 |
||
16/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/11/1950. Dep: 20/12/1950. | ||
23/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1952. Dep: 29/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29418 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/12/1952. Dep: 04/12/1952. | ||
10/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/08/1953. Dep: 20/08/1953. | ||
13/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1954. Dep: 15/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29342 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/10/1955. Dep: 16/12/1955. | ||
29/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1956. Dep: 01/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29385 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
15/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/01/1958. Dep: 11/03/1958. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
11/03/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
09/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/03/1959. Dep: 16/04/1959. Work undertaken: Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
07/05/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
14/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1961. Dep: 25/01/1962. | ||
21/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
16/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60854 from New England (34E) | ||
02/10/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |