|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 20/03/1939 | 31/03/1939 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/08/1939 | 25/08/1939 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/07/1940 | 13/09/1940 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29482 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1941 | 10/11/1941 | 40 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1942 | 07/03/1942 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 29448 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1944 | 01/04/1944 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3091 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1946 | 16/02/1946 | 29 days | General | LNER restored |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1947 | 03/05/1947 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/06/1947 | 09/08/1947 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29368 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1947 | 16/08/1947 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/02/1949 | 02/04/1949 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29488 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60847 |
||
Darlington Works | 16/03/1950 | 22/04/1950 | 38 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1951 | 23/06/1951 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1951 | 28/06/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1951 | 06/12/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29516 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/12/1951 | 21/12/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/11/1953 | 12/12/1953 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29508 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/12/1953 | 17/12/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/12/1953 | 24/12/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/10/1954 | 06/10/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1955 | 18/11/1955 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28058 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1956 | 11/05/1956 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1956 | 11/07/1956 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1958 | 12/04/1958 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29433 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1958 | 21/05/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1959 | 18/02/1959 | 7 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1961 | 11/11/1961 | 80 days | General | Boiler number 29535 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/03/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4818 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1788 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
20/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/03/1939. Dep: 31/03/1939. | ||
03/04/1939 | Naming | Named 'ST. PETER'S SCHOOL' by J.T.Brocklebank, Head Boy of the school at York Station | ||
23/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/08/1939. Dep: 25/08/1939. | ||
31/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1940. Dep: 13/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29482 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/10/1941. Dep: 10/11/1941. | ||
10/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1942. Dep: 07/03/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29448 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1944. Dep: 01/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3091 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 747 but not taken up | ||
19/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1946. Dep: 16/02/1946. Work undertaken: LNER restored |
||
06/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
29/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
30/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 847 | ||
26/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/04/1947. Dep: 03/05/1947. | ||
25/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1947. Dep: 09/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29368 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1947. Dep: 16/08/1947. | ||
24/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1949. Dep: 02/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29488 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60847 |
||
16/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 16/03/1950. Dep: 22/04/1950. | ||
21/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/05/1951. Dep: 23/06/1951. | ||
27/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/06/1951. Dep: 28/06/1951. | ||
08/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1951. Dep: 06/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29516 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1951. Dep: 21/12/1951. | ||
14/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1953. Dep: 12/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29508 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/12/1953. Dep: 17/12/1953. | ||
23/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/12/1953. Dep: 24/12/1953. | ||
04/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/10/1954. Dep: 06/10/1954. | ||
17/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1955. Dep: 18/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28058 (Diagram 109) |
||
24/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/04/1956. Dep: 11/05/1956. | ||
15/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/06/1956. Dep: 11/07/1956. | ||
06/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1958. Dep: 12/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29433 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
15/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/05/1958. Dep: 21/05/1958. | ||
12/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/02/1959. Dep: 18/02/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
24/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1961. Dep: 11/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29535 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
29/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60847 from York (North) (50A) | ||
08/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |