Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 370 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3961 Week
» 14096 Month
» 330327 Year
» 841429 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4816   22/02/1939
LNER (1946 1st) 745   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 845   03/11/1946
BR 60845   22/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Sun 22/02/1939 to Kings Cross (KX)
Withdrawal Sun 23/09/1962 off New England (34E)
Scrapping Thu 13/12/1962 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 23 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster Warks for cutting up 13/12/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KX Kings Cross (New) 22/02/1939
NWE New England 02/08/1940
DON Doncaster 11/03/1944
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 22/01/1945
SHF Sheffield Darnall 28/05/1946
DON Doncaster 22/04/1947
38E Woodford Halse 09/04/1950
35A New England 02/09/1951
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 05/05/1952
35A New England 22/09/1952
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) 20/10/1952
35A New England 05/04/1953
35B Grantham 18/09/1955
35A New England 16/09/1956
   Withdrawn 23/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster 22/04/1947
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse w/e 09/04/1950
ALLOC 35A New England w/e 08/09/1951
LOAN 82C Swindon 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 04/10/1952
LOAN 82C Swindon 4w/e 01/11/1952
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 01/11/1952
EXLOAN 35A New England 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 35B Grantham 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 13/10/1956
WDN   23/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
22/02/1939 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2998)
30/09/1944 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3509)
22/09/1949 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 9191)
08/04/1952 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29404)
03/12/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29394)
08/03/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29440)
26/09/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
03/07/1959 Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
03/07/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 25/03/1939 13/05/1939 50 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 29/07/1939 19/08/1939 22 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 22/02/1941 29/03/1941 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/11/1941 13/12/1941 39 days Heavy
After collision
 
Doncaster Works 26/06/1943 14/08/1943 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/10/1943 13/11/1943 15 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 02/09/1944 30/09/1944 29 days General
Boiler number 3509 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 20/04/1946 04/05/1946 15 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 22/03/1947 22/04/1947 32 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/08/1949 22/09/1949 46 days General
Boiler number 9191 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60845
 
Doncaster Works 09/03/1952 08/04/1952 31 days General
Boiler number 29404 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 21/09/1952 15/10/1952 25 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 04/11/1954 03/12/1954 30 days General
Boiler number 29394 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 06/02/1957 08/03/1957 31 days General
Boiler number 29440 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 23/09/1958 26/09/1958 4 days Unclassified
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 15/04/1959 03/07/1959 80 days General
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
 
Darlington Works 08/07/1959 31/07/1959 24 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/02/1939 To Service To service as LNER Number 4816
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Kings Cross (KX)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
25/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/03/1939. Dep: 13/05/1939.    
29/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/07/1939. Dep: 19/08/1939.    
02/08/1940 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
22/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1941. Dep: 29/03/1941.    
05/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 05/11/1941. Dep: 13/12/1941.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
26/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943.    
30/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/10/1943. Dep: 13/11/1943.    
11/03/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
02/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3509 (Diagram 109)
   
22/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 745 but not taken up    
20/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/04/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946.    
28/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
03/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 845    
22/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1947. Dep: 22/04/1947.    
22/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
08/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1949. Dep: 22/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9191 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60845
   
09/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
09/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1952. Dep: 08/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29404 (Diagram 109)
   
05/05/1952 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
21/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/09/1952. Dep: 15/10/1952.    
22/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
20/10/1952 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
05/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
04/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1954. Dep: 03/12/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29394 (Diagram 109)
   
18/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
16/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
06/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1957. Dep: 08/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29440 (Diagram 109)
   
23/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/09/1958. Dep: 26/09/1958.
Work undertaken:
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
15/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1959. Dep: 03/07/1959.
Work undertaken:
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
   
08/07/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/07/1959. Dep: 31/07/1959.    
23/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 60845 from New England (34E)    
13/12/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev