|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 02/03/1939 | 03/03/1939 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/04/1939 | 29/04/1939 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/01/1940 | 27/01/1940 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1940 | 09/11/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1942 | 28/03/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/03/1943 | 02/04/1943 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1943 | 18/09/1943 | 36 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/08/1945 | 06/10/1945 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1946 | 16/06/1946 | 11 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 844 |
||
Darlington Works | 20/08/1946 | 14/09/1946 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1946 | 25/11/1946 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1947 | 05/12/1947 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3227 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1949 | 17/11/1949 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2912 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60844 |
||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1951 | 22/11/1951 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29473 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1951 | 30/11/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1953 | 05/09/1953 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1953 | 10/09/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Inverurie Works | 07/03/1955 | 08/03/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1955 | 03/12/1955 | 75 days | General | Boiler number 29469 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1955 | 08/12/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1957 | 21/11/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29370 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1957 | 23/12/1957 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1959 | 10/06/1959 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2918 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1960 | 22/09/1960 | 86 days | Light Casual | After collision Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 26/03/1962 | 02/05/1962 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29496 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1962 | 16/05/1962 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/12/1962 | 17/01/1963 | 29 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/06/1964 | 02/10/1964 | 116 days | Heavy Casual | Derailment damage |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
06/04/1946 | Market Harborough | On 6/4/46 the three parts of the 12 noon ex St. Pancras were hauled by 5279 (14B); 5259 (10C); and 5715 (12A), respectively. In the up direction, the 2.40 p.m. ex Leicester was behind 4808 (5A), whilst of the two portions of the 4.50 p.m. ex Leicester (nominally a 19G duty) were worked by 5105 (26A), and 4815 (17A). | SLS/194605 |
30/03/1946 | Crewe/Horwich - Class 5 builds | Further class 5 4-6-0 will be built during 1946 a follows: 4932-66/82-96 or Horwich, 4967-81 at Crewe. | SLS/194605 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington MPD (Waiting works) | Ex-Works on 51A: D3072, D3874, D5108, 43055, 43101, 60835, 60939, 61019/39, 63388, 65794, 65889/92, 68011, 80116, 90072, 90342, 90503. Waiting works on 51A: 12115, 43070/5, 46494, 60811/44, 61237, 68754, 78015, 92098. | SLS/196205 |
04/07/1964 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. | SLS/196408 |
19/09/1964 | Darlington Works (Main Erecting shop) | New Engine Shop: D3940, 12116, tender of 60530. Main Erecting shop: 60530 Sayajirao, 60844, 61214, 61330, 62059, 73095, 73132, 76095/9, 93368/610, D2246/72, D3657. Yard Paint shop: 60118 Archibald Sturrock. Yard: 43008 an 62041 being painted, 60522 Straight Deal, 60145 Saint Mungo, 60011 frames only, 61038 without nameplates, 61084, 63393, 65033/99, 43123, 44734, 68062, D2700, 90407; North Rd. scrap yard: 61229, 61321 and tender of 60020. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/02/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4815 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1785 Allocated to St Margarets (STM) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
02/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1939. Dep: 03/03/1939. | ||
25/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1939. Dep: 29/04/1939. | ||
22/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1940. Dep: 27/01/1940. | ||
05/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1940. Dep: 09/11/1940. | ||
05/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
14/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1942. Dep: 28/03/1942. | ||
29/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/03/1943. Dep: 02/04/1943. | ||
14/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943. | ||
12/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
13/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 744 but not taken up | ||
06/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/06/1946. Dep: 16/06/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 844 |
||
20/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/08/1946. Dep: 14/09/1946. | ||
07/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/11/1946. Dep: 25/11/1946. | ||
04/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1947. Dep: 05/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3227 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1949. Dep: 17/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2912 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60844 |
||
16/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1951. Dep: 22/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29473 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/11/1951. Dep: 30/11/1951. | ||
04/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/08/1953. Dep: 05/09/1953. | ||
07/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/09/1953. Dep: 10/09/1953. | ||
07/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/03/1955. Dep: 08/03/1955. | ||
20/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1955. Dep: 03/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29469 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/12/1955. Dep: 08/12/1955. | ||
17/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1957. Dep: 21/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29370 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/12/1957. Dep: 23/12/1957. | ||
11/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1959. Dep: 10/06/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2918 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/06/1960. Dep: 22/09/1960. Work undertaken: After collision Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
26/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1962. Dep: 02/05/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29496 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
08/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/05/1962. Dep: 16/05/1962. | ||
20/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1962. Dep: 17/01/1963. | ||
09/06/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/06/1964. Dep: 02/10/1964. Work undertaken: Derailment damage |
||
08/11/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60844 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
12/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |