Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 370 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3961 Week
» 14096 Month
» 330327 Year
» 841429 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4813   09/12/1938
LNER (1946 1st) 742   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 842   07/12/1946
BR 60842   12/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 09/12/1938 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Mon 22/10/1962 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping Mon 03/12/1962 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 23 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington Works for cutting up 3/12/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) 09/12/1938
DON Doncaster 10/03/1944
NWE New England 24/10/1946
35B Grantham 11/08/1957
38C Leicester (G.C.) 15/09/1957
50A York (North) 06/09/1959
   Withdrawn 22/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 35B Grantham 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 38C Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 05/10/1957
LOAN 15E Leicester (G.C.) 01/02/1958
ALLOC 15E Leicester (G.C.) 23/02/1958
ALLOC 91NE   8w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 03/10/1959
WDN   w/e 22/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/12/1938 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2966)
29/08/1942 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3134)
14/01/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3319)
12/05/1950 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3285)
20/06/1952 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29414)
08/06/1956 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29420)
12/06/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29512)
26/08/1960 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28080)
26/08/1960 Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 11/02/1939 11/03/1939 29 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 24/02/1940 02/03/1940 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 11/05/1940 08/06/1940 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 01/08/1942 29/08/1942 29 days General
Boiler number 3134 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 17/06/1944 22/07/1944 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 13/04/1946 01/06/1946 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 31/10/1947 14/01/1948 76 days General
Boiler number 3319 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 09/04/1950 12/05/1950 34 days General
Boiler number 3285 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60842
 
Doncaster Works 15/02/1951 02/03/1951 16 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 14/02/1952 04/03/1952 20 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 26/05/1952 20/06/1952 26 days General
Boiler number 29414 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 31/05/1954 13/07/1954 44 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 30/04/1956 08/06/1956 40 days General
Boiler number 29420 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 12/05/1958 12/06/1958 32 days General
Boiler number 29512 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 04/07/1960 26/08/1960 54 days General
Boiler number 28080 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
 
Darlington Works 12/10/1960 26/10/1960 15 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/12/1938 To Service To service as LNER Number 4813
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
11/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/02/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939.    
24/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/02/1940. Dep: 02/03/1940.    
11/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940.    
01/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1942. Dep: 29/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3134 (Diagram 109)
   
10/03/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
17/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1944. Dep: 22/07/1944.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 742 but not taken up    
13/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946.    
24/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
07/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 842    
31/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1947. Dep: 14/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3319 (Diagram 109)
   
09/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1950. Dep: 12/05/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3285 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60842
   
15/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/02/1951. Dep: 02/03/1951.    
14/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1952. Dep: 04/03/1952.    
26/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1952. Dep: 20/06/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29414 (Diagram 109)
   
31/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 31/05/1954. Dep: 13/07/1954.    
30/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1956. Dep: 08/06/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29420 (Diagram 109)
   
11/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
15/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C)    
12/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1958. Dep: 12/06/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29512 (Diagram 109)
   
06/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
04/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1960. Dep: 26/08/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28080 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
   
12/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/10/1960. Dep: 26/10/1960.    
22/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 60842 from York (North) (50A)    
03/12/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev