|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 04/11/1938 | 04/11/1938 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/01/1939 | 15/02/1939 | 19 days | Unclassified | Alteration to tender |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/01/1940 | 25/01/1940 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1940 | 05/10/1940 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1942 | 14/03/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/07/1943 | 28/08/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1945 | 18/04/1945 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2912 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1947 | 28/06/1947 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29522 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/04/1949 | 12/05/1949 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29449 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60840 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1950 | 28/10/1950 | 48 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1952 | 06/12/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28054 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1952 | 09/12/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1953 | 29/08/1953 | 67 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1955 | 25/03/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29492 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1956 | 14/11/1956 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29493 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/08/1958 | 30/09/1958 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29361 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1960 | 14/01/1961 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29394 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/11/1963 | Inverurie Works (Cut Up) | Shopped: 42737, 45475, D6149, D8030. Cut Up: 60819/27, 60937, 64627, 65253, 65341. Four weeks ending 30th November, 1963. Shopped: 42909, 44955, 65918, D6147/57. Cut Up: 57269, 57336, 57634, 60840/94, 64950, 64629. Four weeks ending 28th December, 1963. Shopped: 42919, 44703, D3930, D6140/42/45/52/54/55/56. Cut Up: 60898, 60972, 64557, 64600, 65900, 90019. Total for 1963: Steam-33 Shopped, 31 other repairs; Diesel-31 Shopped, 15 other repairs; Cut Up 86. Two weeks ending 10th January, 1964. Shopped: 61132, D6150. Cut Up: 60161, 64619. In Shops on 10th January: 44722, 64558/99, D368, D3935, D6139/51/53. Awaiting scrapping: 60089, 60159, 64579. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/10/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4811 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1777 Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
04/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/11/1938. Dep: 04/11/1938. | ||
28/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/01/1939. Dep: 15/02/1939. Work undertaken: Alteration to tender |
||
12/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/01/1940. Dep: 25/01/1940. | ||
24/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1940. Dep: 05/10/1940. | ||
31/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1942. Dep: 14/03/1942. | ||
31/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1943. Dep: 28/08/1943. | ||
13/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1945. Dep: 18/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2912 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 740 but not taken up | ||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 840 | ||
22/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1947. Dep: 28/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29522 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1949. Dep: 12/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29449 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60840 |
||
11/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/09/1950. Dep: 28/10/1950. | ||
19/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
07/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1952. Dep: 06/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28054 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/12/1952. Dep: 09/12/1952. | ||
24/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 24/06/1953. Dep: 29/08/1953. | ||
24/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1955. Dep: 25/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29492 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1956. Dep: 14/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29493 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1958. Dep: 30/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29361 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1960. Dep: 14/01/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29394 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60840 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
29/11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |