|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 28/10/1938 | 01/11/1938 | 5 days | Unclassified | Alteration to tender |
||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1939 | 20/02/1939 | 38 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1939 | 03/03/1939 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1940 | 25/01/1940 | 4 days | Unclassified | Pony truck exam |
||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1940 | 23/07/1940 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2895 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/09/1941 | 16/10/1941 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1941 | 30/01/1942 | 61 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1943 | 11/03/1943 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29361 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1945 | 24/02/1945 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1947 | 08/03/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3054 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1948 | 05/06/1948 | 34 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60839 |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/12/1949 | 24/12/1949 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/01/1950 | 17/02/1950 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3012 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1950 | 25/02/1950 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/02/1952 | 28/03/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29517 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1954 | 01/07/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29549 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/07/1954 | 11/08/1954 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/10/1954 | 30/10/1954 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/01/1956 | 14/02/1956 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29502 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1958 | 08/05/1958 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29539 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1959 | 04/02/1959 | 7 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1960 | 04/11/1960 | 54 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1962 | 07/09/1962 | 9 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/10/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4810 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1776 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
28/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/10/1938. Dep: 01/11/1938. Work undertaken: Alteration to tender |
||
14/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/01/1939. Dep: 20/02/1939. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
02/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1939. Dep: 03/03/1939. | ||
22/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/01/1940. Dep: 25/01/1940. Work undertaken: Pony truck exam |
||
20/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1940. Dep: 23/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2895 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/09/1941. Dep: 16/10/1941. | ||
01/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/12/1941. Dep: 30/01/1942. | ||
02/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1943. Dep: 11/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29361 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1945. Dep: 24/02/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 739 but not taken up | ||
06/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
29/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 839 | ||
01/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3054 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1948. Dep: 05/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60839 |
||
15/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/12/1949. Dep: 24/12/1949. | ||
06/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1950. Dep: 17/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3012 (Diagram 109) |
||
21/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/02/1950. Dep: 25/02/1950. | ||
27/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1952. Dep: 28/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29517 (Diagram 109) |
||
31/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1954. Dep: 01/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29549 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/07/1954. Dep: 11/08/1954. | ||
18/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/10/1954. Dep: 30/10/1954. | ||
12/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1956. Dep: 14/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29502 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1958. Dep: 08/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29539 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
29/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/01/1959. Dep: 04/02/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
12/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/09/1960. Dep: 04/11/1960. | ||
30/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/08/1962. Dep: 07/09/1962. | ||
22/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60839 from York (North) (50A) | ||
13/12/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |