|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 08/12/1938 | 13/12/1938 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1939 | 14/03/1939 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/08/1939 | 07/09/1939 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1940 | 09/02/1940 | 5 days | Unclassified | Pony truck exam |
||
Darlington Works | 07/03/1940 | 16/04/1940 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/05/1940 | 17/05/1940 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1942 | 31/10/1942 | 69 days | General | MLS regulator off |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1945 | 21/04/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 8933 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1946 | 01/06/1946 | 120 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 837 |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1947 | 15/02/1947 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29369 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/11/1948 | 18/12/1948 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 3455 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60837 |
||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1950 | 27/01/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29462 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/01/1952 | 19/01/1952 | 11 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1953 | 14/03/1953 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2905 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/03/1953 | 17/03/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/02/1954 | 15/03/1954 | 40 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 21/01/1955 | 19/02/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29510 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1955 | 22/02/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1955 | 05/08/1955 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1956 | 29/12/1956 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29484 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1957 | 16/04/1957 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1959 | 14/04/1959 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 29442 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1961 | 21/02/1961 | 37 days | General | Smith speedometer fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
06/04/1946 | Market Harborough | On 6/4/46 the three parts of the 12 noon ex St. Pancras were hauled by 5279 (14B); 5259 (10C); and 5715 (12A), respectively. In the up direction, the 2.40 p.m. ex Leicester was behind 4808 (5A), whilst of the two portions of the 4.50 p.m. ex Leicester (nominally a 19G duty) were worked by 5105 (26A), and 4815 (17A). | SLS/194605 |
30/03/1946 | Crewe/Horwich - Class 5 builds | Further class 5 4-6-0 will be built during 1946 a follows: 4932-66/82-96 or Horwich, 4967-81 at Crewe. | SLS/194605 |
28/02/1954 | Darlington Works | North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. | SLS/195404 |
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/10/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4808 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1774 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
08/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/12/1938. Dep: 13/12/1938. | ||
10/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/03/1939. Dep: 14/03/1939. | ||
23/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/08/1939. Dep: 07/09/1939. | ||
05/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1940. Dep: 09/02/1940. Work undertaken: Pony truck exam |
||
07/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1940. Dep: 16/04/1940. | ||
13/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/05/1940. Dep: 17/05/1940. | ||
24/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1942. Dep: 31/10/1942. Work undertaken: MLS regulator off |
||
10/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8933 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 737 but not taken up | ||
02/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 837 |
||
08/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1947. Dep: 15/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29369 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1948. Dep: 18/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3455 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60837 |
||
28/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1950. Dep: 27/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29462 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/01/1952. Dep: 19/01/1952. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
05/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1953. Dep: 14/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2905 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/03/1953. Dep: 17/03/1953. | ||
04/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/02/1954. Dep: 15/03/1954. | ||
21/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1955. Dep: 19/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29510 (Diagram 109) |
||
21/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/02/1955. Dep: 22/02/1955. | ||
29/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
26/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
05/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/08/1955. Dep: 05/08/1955. | ||
23/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1956. Dep: 29/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29484 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/04/1957. Dep: 16/04/1957. | ||
05/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1959. Dep: 14/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29442 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
16/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1961. Dep: 21/02/1961. Work undertaken: Smith speedometer fitted |
||
21/02/1962 | Modification | Diagram 109 number 29473 boiler fitted | ||
21/02/1962 | Modification | Diagram 109 number 3469 boiler fitted | ||
16/11/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60837 from York (North) (50A) | ||
12/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge |