Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 370 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3961 Week
» 14096 Month
» 330327 Year
» 841429 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4807   23/09/1938
LNER (1946 1st) 736   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 836   27/10/1946
BR 60836   13/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Sat 23/09/1938 to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)
Withdrawal Sat 31/12/1966 off Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)
Scrapping Fri 07/07/1967 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 28 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Motherwell Machinery and Scrap Co , Wishaw, 7/7/67

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DEE Dundee Tay Bridge (New) 23/09/1938
STM St Margarets 11/1939
HAY Haymarket 05/1941
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 10/1941
HAY Haymarket 11/1941
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 08/1942
STM St Margarets 12/1942
HAY Haymarket 17/04/1943
64A St Margarets 25/09/1949
64B Haymarket 14/01/1951
64A St Margarets 04/03/1951
65A Eastfield 11/07/1960
65B St Rollox (Balornock) 24/10/1960
64A St Margarets 17/11/1960
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 24/11/1963
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 13/04/1964
   Withdrawn 31/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STM St Margarets w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 64B Haymarket m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 64A St Margarets m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 30/07/1960
ALLOC 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 19/11/1960
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 09/05/1964
WDN   w/e 31/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
23/09/1938 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2954)
06/07/1945 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2900)
27/08/1949 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2937)
12/12/1953 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29518)
25/06/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29479)
10/06/1959 Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
06/10/1960 Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
06/10/1960 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29512)
09/11/1962 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28078)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 08/12/1938 13/12/1938 6 days Unclassified
Alteration to tender
 
Cowlairs Works 18/01/1940 03/02/1940 17 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 01/06/1940 03/06/1940 3 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 03/08/1940 07/09/1940 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 16/08/1941 20/09/1941 36 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 20/02/1942 28/03/1942 37 days General
MLS regulator 0ff
 
Doncaster Works 14/08/1943 11/09/1943 29 days General  
Darlington Works 09/08/1944 18/08/1944 10 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 22/03/1945 06/07/1945 107 days General
Boiler number 2900 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 10/08/1946 14/09/1946 36 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 01/02/1947 15/03/1947 43 days General  
Darlington Works 31/03/1947 31/03/1947 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 03/04/1948 13/05/1948 41 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 60836
 
Darlington Works 09/07/1949 27/08/1949 50 days General
Boiler number 2937 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 21/06/1951 19/07/1951 29 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 06/11/1953 12/12/1953 37 days General
Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 14/12/1953 22/12/1953 9 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/03/1956 17/04/1956 42 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 22/05/1958 25/06/1958 35 days General
Boiler number 29479 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 18/03/1959 10/06/1959 85 days Heavy Casual
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
 
Darlington Works 24/08/1960 06/10/1960 44 days General
Boiler number 29512 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
 
Darlington Works 04/10/1962 09/11/1962 37 days General
Boiler number 28078 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 20/12/1962 18/02/1963 61 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 02/07/1964 28/08/1964 58 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/09/1938 To Service To service as LNER Number 4807
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
08/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/12/1938. Dep: 13/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Alteration to tender
   
11/1939 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (STM)    
18/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/01/1940. Dep: 03/02/1940.    
01/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/06/1940. Dep: 03/06/1940.    
03/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1940. Dep: 07/09/1940.    
05/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
16/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/08/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941.    
10/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
11/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
20/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1942. Dep: 28/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
MLS regulator 0ff
   
08/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
12/1942 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (STM)    
17/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
14/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1943. Dep: 11/09/1943.    
09/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/08/1944. Dep: 18/08/1944.    
22/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1945. Dep: 06/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2900 (Diagram 109)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 736 but not taken up    
10/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1946. Dep: 14/09/1946.    
27/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 836    
01/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947.    
31/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 31/03/1947. Dep: 31/03/1947.    
03/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/04/1948. Dep: 13/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 60836
   
09/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1949. Dep: 27/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2937 (Diagram 109)
   
25/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
14/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
04/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
21/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/06/1951. Dep: 19/07/1951.    
06/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1953. Dep: 12/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 109)
   
14/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/12/1953. Dep: 22/12/1953.    
07/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/03/1956. Dep: 17/04/1956.    
22/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1958. Dep: 25/06/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29479 (Diagram 109)
   
18/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/03/1959. Dep: 10/06/1959.
Work undertaken:
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
   
11/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
24/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1960. Dep: 06/10/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29512 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
   
24/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B)    
17/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
04/10/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1962. Dep: 09/11/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28078 (Diagram 109)
   
20/12/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/12/1962. Dep: 18/02/1963.    
24/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
02/07/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/07/1964. Dep: 28/08/1964.    
31/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 60836 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
07/07/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev