|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 08/12/1938 | 13/12/1938 | 6 days | Unclassified | Alteration to tender |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/01/1940 | 03/02/1940 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/06/1940 | 03/06/1940 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/08/1940 | 07/09/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1941 | 20/09/1941 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1942 | 28/03/1942 | 37 days | General | MLS regulator 0ff |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1943 | 11/09/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1944 | 18/08/1944 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1945 | 06/07/1945 | 107 days | General | Boiler number 2900 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1946 | 14/09/1946 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1947 | 15/03/1947 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1947 | 31/03/1947 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 03/04/1948 | 13/05/1948 | 41 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 60836 |
||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1949 | 27/08/1949 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2937 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1951 | 19/07/1951 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 06/11/1953 | 12/12/1953 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29518 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/12/1953 | 22/12/1953 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/03/1956 | 17/04/1956 | 42 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1958 | 25/06/1958 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29479 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/03/1959 | 10/06/1959 | 85 days | Heavy Casual | Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1960 | 06/10/1960 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29512 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 04/10/1962 | 09/11/1962 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28078 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/12/1962 | 18/02/1963 | 61 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/07/1964 | 28/08/1964 | 58 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1947 | General | The 2.5 p.m. Darlington to Leeds train (return from Leeds at 6.45 p.m.) continues as a running-in train for locos. ex-North Road Works. Since the appearance of 'V2' No. 836 (HAY) on 1/4, the consecutive appearance of new 'Bl' on this turn has been broken; No. 836 having worked intermittently on the train up to 2/6-an unusually long running-in period for Scottish Area 'V2,' which usually work this train only once or twice. The latest 'Bl' noted are Nos. 1026 on 29/4, 1022 on 16/5, and 1028 on 28/5. Nos. 1024/7 have not yet appeared on this turn. Two new conversions are No. 1468 to 'B16/3' and No. 1607 to 'B2,' and which first worked this train on 23/5 and 27/5 respectively. | SLS/194708 |
04/07/1964 | Darlington Works (Stripping Shop) | Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. | SLS/196408 |
20/09/1964 | Swindon Works (Scrap yard) | On the occasion of the Society farewell to the last G.W.R. County class tour, the following were on works:- Erecting Shop: D602, D806/19/37/43/9, D1001/6/9/14/15/28/32/43/58, D6335/57, D7009/73, 2210, 6862, 6951, 7803, 7924, 43001/137, 73034 an 92223. New Construction: D9512 complete and painted, D9513-6 almost complete, D9517-24 under construction. Top end of shop, PWM653, D3026/32/190/807/14/24. Weighing shed: D850, D1049, Outside in works yard: 4659, 8405/9, 8732, 9425/27, 42954/78, 43115/20, 60941/45, D1016/24, D6352, D7048, N.C.B. 0-6-2T (ex T.V.R.) and King 6000 (for movement to Stratford). Scrap yard: 2818, 5698, 6010, 6824/7/73, 7929, 8418, 9484, 60809/12/33/6/87, 60916/22/5/32/64/75, 43012/112. Stock shed: D3352, D6826, D9510/11. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/09/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4807 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1773 Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
08/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/12/1938. Dep: 13/12/1938. Work undertaken: Alteration to tender |
||
11/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
18/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/01/1940. Dep: 03/02/1940. | ||
01/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/06/1940. Dep: 03/06/1940. | ||
03/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1940. Dep: 07/09/1940. | ||
05/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
16/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/08/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941. | ||
10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
11/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
20/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1942. Dep: 28/03/1942. Work undertaken: MLS regulator 0ff |
||
08/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
12/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
17/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
14/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1943. Dep: 11/09/1943. | ||
09/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/08/1944. Dep: 18/08/1944. | ||
22/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1945. Dep: 06/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2900 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 736 but not taken up | ||
10/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1946. Dep: 14/09/1946. | ||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 836 | ||
01/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947. | ||
31/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 31/03/1947. Dep: 31/03/1947. | ||
03/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/04/1948. Dep: 13/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60836 |
||
09/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1949. Dep: 27/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2937 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
01/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
14/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
04/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
21/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/06/1951. Dep: 19/07/1951. | ||
06/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1953. Dep: 12/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29518 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/12/1953. Dep: 22/12/1953. | ||
07/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/03/1956. Dep: 17/04/1956. | ||
22/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1958. Dep: 25/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29479 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/03/1959. Dep: 10/06/1959. Work undertaken: Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
11/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
24/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1960. Dep: 06/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29512 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
24/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) | ||
17/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
04/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1962. Dep: 09/11/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28078 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/12/1962. Dep: 18/02/1963. | ||
24/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
13/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
02/07/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/07/1964. Dep: 28/08/1964. | ||
31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60836 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
07/07/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |