|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Inverurie Works | 22/03/1939 | 22/03/1939 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1939 | 28/04/1939 | 18 days | Unclassified | Alteration to tender |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/01/1940 | 27/01/1940 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1940 | 15/06/1940 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1941 | 05/04/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1942 | 14/11/1942 | 43 days | General | MLS regulator off |
||
Darlington Works | 17/03/1944 | 19/04/1944 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 3270 (Diagram 109) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/06/1944 | 10/06/1944 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1945 | 24/08/1945 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1946 | 08/03/1946 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29471 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1946 | 16/11/1946 | 57 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1947 | 31/10/1947 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1948 | 13/05/1948 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2918 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60834 |
||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1948 | 28/05/1948 | 11 days | Unclassified | Special painting |
||
Darlington Works | 31/12/1949 | 03/02/1950 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3227 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1951 | 01/09/1951 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 29500 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1953 | 20/06/1953 | 41 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1955 | 29/12/1955 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29453 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/09/1957 | 26/10/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29424 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1957 | 30/10/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1959 | 14/01/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29381 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1962 | 29/06/1962 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29540 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1962 | 10/08/1962 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1962 | 05/12/1962 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Inverurie Works | 30/04/1963 | 01/05/1963 | 2 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
31/12/1946 | General | New 'B.1' 4-6-0's, Nos. 1089-99, etc. (from 1094 they are green), are much in evidence on outer suburban, Hitchin' etc., workings at King's Cross. Scottish visitors seen there before Christmas were: Blue 'A.4' 4, William Whitelaw, and 'V.2' 834 (late 4805), both of Haymarket. Gateshead or Heaton 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' often get through to London. N.E., G.C., and G.E. locos. still appear from time to time on G.N. freight, parcel or similar trains. The G.E. principal express workings to Liverpool Street (including the East Anglian) from Norwich are regularly operated by the new standard 2-cyl. 4-6-0's, with drivers keeping their own loco. as far as possible. These excellent engines are on other G.E. as well as G.C. fast passenger turns also. | SLS/194702 |
31/07/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order. Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year. No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751. Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420. |
SLS/194808 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington MPD (Ex Works) | Stored: 43070 (51L), 43101 (51L), 65768, 65772, 65773, 69002 (51A), 78015 (51J). Ex Works: 43014 (50A), 43125 (50B), 60834 (62B), 60944 (52B), 60973 (63A), 62004 (51A), 63389 (51L), 68043 (51A), 90011 (51A), 90273 (51L), 90430 (51A), 92098 (52H). Awaiting Works: 42639 (50F), 43134 (66D), 46494 (31A), 60818 (64A), 64706 (52G), 64713, 64730 (51L), 64757 (51L), 64758 (51L), 64821 (51L), 64835 (51F), 64848 (51F), 64982 (51F), 65670, 65761, 65776. Visitors : D12 (55H), 42553 (50A), 60040 (52A). | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/09/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4805 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1771 Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
22/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/03/1939. Dep: 22/03/1939. | ||
11/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/04/1939. Dep: 28/04/1939. Work undertaken: Alteration to tender |
||
27/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 27/01/1940. | ||
18/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/05/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940. | ||
01/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1941. Dep: 05/04/1941. | ||
03/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1942. Dep: 14/11/1942. Work undertaken: MLS regulator off |
||
23/10/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
17/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
17/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1944. Dep: 19/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3270 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/06/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944. | ||
30/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/07/1945. Dep: 24/08/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 734 but not taken up | ||
26/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1946. Dep: 08/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29471 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 834 | ||
21/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/09/1946. Dep: 16/11/1946. | ||
08/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/10/1947. Dep: 31/10/1947. | ||
30/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1948. Dep: 13/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2918 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60834 |
||
18/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/05/1948. Dep: 28/05/1948. Work undertaken: Special painting |
||
31/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1949. Dep: 03/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3227 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
09/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1951. Dep: 01/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29500 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/05/1953. Dep: 20/06/1953. | ||
25/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1955. Dep: 29/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29453 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1957. Dep: 26/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29424 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/10/1957. Dep: 30/10/1957. | ||
08/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1959. Dep: 14/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29381 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1962. Dep: 29/06/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29540 (Diagram 109) |
||
30/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/07/1962. Dep: 10/08/1962. | ||
07/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/11/1962. Dep: 05/12/1962. | ||
30/04/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/04/1963. Dep: 01/05/1963. | ||
19/03/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60834 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
11/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |