|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1939 | 25/03/1939 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1940 | 20/04/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1942 | 26/09/1942 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2966 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1944 | 26/08/1944 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3499 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1945 | 15/12/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1946 | 12/10/1946 | 22 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 832 |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1947 | 21/11/1947 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 9546 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1949 | 17/03/1949 | 24 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 60832 |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1950 | 27/03/1950 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/03/1950 | 06/05/1950 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 9544 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/01/1951 | 26/01/1951 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1951 | 30/04/1951 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1954 | 12/02/1954 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 29385 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1955 | 19/11/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29379 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1957 | 10/10/1957 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29462 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/10/1958 | 29/10/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 18/03/1959 | 20/03/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1960 | 26/05/1960 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28053 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1960 | 22/06/1960 | 9 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1950 | Doncaster Works | Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/07/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4803 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1766 Allocated to St Margarets (STM) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
03/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
07/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
21/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/03/1939. Dep: 25/03/1939. | ||
16/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1940. Dep: 20/04/1940. | ||
18/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
22/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2966 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1944. Dep: 26/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3499 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
08/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/12/1945. Dep: 15/12/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 732 but not taken up | ||
28/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
21/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 832 |
||
22/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1947. Dep: 21/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9546 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/02/1949. Dep: 17/03/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60832 |
||
19/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
25/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
26/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1950. Dep: 27/03/1950. | ||
30/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9544 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/01/1951. Dep: 26/01/1951. | ||
11/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
13/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/04/1951. Dep: 30/04/1951. | ||
27/03/1952 | Modification | Diagram 109 number 29402 boiler fitted | ||
31/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1954. Dep: 12/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29385 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1955. Dep: 19/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29379 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1957. Dep: 10/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29462 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/10/1958. Dep: 29/10/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
18/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/03/1959. Dep: 20/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
11/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1960. Dep: 26/05/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28053 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/06/1960. Dep: 22/06/1960. | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60832 from New England (34E) | ||
12/06/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |