Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 372 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3963 Week
» 14098 Month
» 330329 Year
» 841431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4799   28/03/1938
LNER (1946 1st) 728   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 828   13/10/1946
BR 60828   24/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 28/03/1938 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 04/10/1965 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 27 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to J Cashmore, Great Bridge, 11/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) 28/03/1938
DON Doncaster 06/09/1938
GOR Gorton 25/11/1944
NWE New England 23/10/1946
34A Kings Cross 20/06/1954
34E Neasden 10/07/1955
34A Kings Cross 02/10/1955
15E Leicester (G.C.) 11/03/1958
50A York (North) 02/11/1958
   Withdrawn 04/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 34E Neasden 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 08/10/1955
LOAN 15E Leicester (G.C.) 3w/e 22/03/1958
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 28/03/1958
ALLOC 15E Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 19/04/1958
LOAN 50A York (North) 4w/e 29/11/1958
LOAN 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 27/12/1958
WDN   w/e 04/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
28/03/1938 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2928)
15/12/1945 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2901)
03/10/1949 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3160)
20/11/1953 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29364)
06/07/1955 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29422)
08/05/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29394)
30/10/1958 Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
26/01/1959 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
23/04/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
18/02/1960 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28056)
20/10/1962 Smith speedometer fitted
20/10/1962 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28050)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 12/05/1938 17/05/1938 6 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 11/03/1939 18/03/1939 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 03/07/1939 19/08/1939 48 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/09/1939 18/10/1939 26 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 21/06/1941 26/07/1941 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/05/1943 05/06/1943 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 29/01/1944 26/02/1944 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/10/1945 15/12/1945 50 days General
Boiler number 2901 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 09/06/1947 19/07/1947 41 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/08/1949 03/10/1949 42 days General
Boiler number 3160 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60828
 
Doncaster Works 20/08/1951 25/09/1951 37 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 20/10/1953 20/11/1953 32 days General
Boiler number 29364 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 25/05/1955 06/07/1955 43 days General
Boiler number 29422 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 30/08/1955 18/10/1955 50 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 05/04/1957 08/05/1957 34 days General
Boiler number 29394 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 22/04/1958 21/05/1958 30 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 23/09/1958 30/10/1958 38 days Heavy Casual
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
 
Darlington Works 14/01/1959 26/01/1959 13 days Unclassified
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 21/04/1959 23/04/1959 3 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 05/01/1960 18/02/1960 45 days General
Boiler number 28056 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 11/09/1961 14/09/1961 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 11/09/1962 20/10/1962 40 days General
Boiler number 28050 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
 
Darlington Works 23/11/1962 06/12/1962 14 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/03/1938 To Service To service as LNER Number 4799
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
12/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/05/1938. Dep: 17/05/1938.    
06/09/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
11/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/03/1939. Dep: 18/03/1939.    
03/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1939. Dep: 19/08/1939.    
23/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/09/1939. Dep: 18/10/1939.    
21/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1941. Dep: 26/07/1941.    
08/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1943. Dep: 05/06/1943.    
29/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1944. Dep: 26/02/1944.    
25/11/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
27/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1945. Dep: 15/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2901 (Diagram 109)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 728 but not taken up    
13/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 828    
23/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
09/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1947. Dep: 19/07/1947.    
23/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1949. Dep: 03/10/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3160 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60828
   
20/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/08/1951. Dep: 25/09/1951.    
20/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1953. Dep: 20/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29364 (Diagram 109)
   
20/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
25/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1955. Dep: 06/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29422 (Diagram 109)
   
10/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (34E)    
30/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/08/1955. Dep: 18/10/1955.    
02/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
05/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1957. Dep: 08/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29394 (Diagram 109)
   
11/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E)    
22/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/04/1958. Dep: 21/05/1958.    
23/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 23/09/1958. Dep: 30/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
   
02/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
14/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/01/1959. Dep: 26/01/1959.
Work undertaken:
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
21/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/04/1959. Dep: 23/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
05/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1960. Dep: 18/02/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28056 (Diagram 109)
   
11/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/09/1961. Dep: 14/09/1961.    
11/09/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1962. Dep: 20/10/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28050 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
   
23/11/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/11/1962. Dep: 06/12/1962.    
04/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 60828 from York (North) (50A)    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev