|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 14/05/1938 | 18/05/1938 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/02/1939 | 08/07/1939 | 134 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1941 | 15/03/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1943 | 26/06/1943 | 71 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/01/1945 | 03/03/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29518 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/12/1946 | 22/02/1947 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 109) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/01/1948 | 17/01/1948 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1948 | 12/11/1948 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 3000 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60827 |
||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1950 | 06/04/1950 | 37 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/12/1951 | 15/12/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1952 | 08/03/1952 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29530 (Diagram 109) |
||
Inverurie Works | 12/11/1952 | 14/11/1952 | 3 days | Light Casual | Tender only |
||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1953 | 31/10/1953 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1953 | 04/11/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1955 | 23/04/1955 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 29444 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1955 | 11/05/1955 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/05/1955 | 17/05/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Inverurie Works | 11/07/1955 | 14/07/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | New set of superheater elements |
||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1957 | 23/02/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29441 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/02/1957 | 26/02/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1957 | 15/10/1957 | 48 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1958 | 08/01/1959 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1960 | 20/10/1960 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29367 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1960 | 08/11/1960 | 5 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/11/1948 | Darlington Works | The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's. It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable. |
SLS/194812 |
10/10/1963 | Inverurie Works (Scrap Yard) | 42737, 42909, 45475, 65918. In Scrap Yard: 60819/27, 64627, 65253/341. Shopped four weeks ended 4/10-44724, 45066, 80126, D6148/50, D8031; Scrapped same period-45049, 60851/959, 64568, 65316, 90193, 90536/42. | SLS/196311 |
02/11/1963 | Inverurie Works (Cut Up) | Shopped: 42737, 45475, D6149, D8030. Cut Up: 60819/27, 60937, 64627, 65253, 65341. Four weeks ending 30th November, 1963. Shopped: 42909, 44955, 65918, D6147/57. Cut Up: 57269, 57336, 57634, 60840/94, 64950, 64629. Four weeks ending 28th December, 1963. Shopped: 42919, 44703, D3930, D6140/42/45/52/54/55/56. Cut Up: 60898, 60972, 64557, 64600, 65900, 90019. Total for 1963: Steam-33 Shopped, 31 other repairs; Diesel-31 Shopped, 15 other repairs; Cut Up 86. Two weeks ending 10th January, 1964. Shopped: 61132, D6150. Cut Up: 60161, 64619. In Shops on 10th January: 44722, 64558/99, D368, D3935, D6139/51/53. Awaiting scrapping: 60089, 60159, 64579. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/01/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4798 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1727 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
14/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1938. Dep: 18/05/1938. | ||
01/10/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
25/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1939. Dep: 08/07/1939. | ||
26/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
08/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1941. Dep: 15/03/1941. | ||
17/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1943. Dep: 26/06/1943. | ||
20/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29518 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/10/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 727 but not taken up | ||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 827 | ||
27/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1946. Dep: 22/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/01/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
10/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/01/1948. Dep: 17/01/1948. | ||
02/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1948. Dep: 12/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3000 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60827 |
||
01/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 01/03/1950. Dep: 06/04/1950. | ||
14/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/12/1951. Dep: 15/12/1951. | ||
05/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1952. Dep: 08/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29530 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/11/1952. Dep: 14/11/1952. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
28/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/09/1953. Dep: 31/10/1953. | ||
02/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/11/1953. Dep: 04/11/1953. | ||
31/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1955. Dep: 23/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29444 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1955. Dep: 11/05/1955. | ||
16/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/05/1955. Dep: 17/05/1955. | ||
11/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1955. Dep: 14/07/1955. Work undertaken: New set of superheater elements |
||
22/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1957. Dep: 23/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29441 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/02/1957. Dep: 26/02/1957. | ||
29/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/08/1957. Dep: 15/10/1957. | ||
26/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/11/1958. Dep: 08/01/1959. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
01/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
10/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
06/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1960. Dep: 20/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29367 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
04/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/11/1960. Dep: 08/11/1960. | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60827 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
25/10/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |