|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 26/05/1938 | 31/05/1938 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1939 | 11/03/1939 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/05/1939 | 24/06/1939 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1940 | 02/03/1940 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1941 | 24/05/1941 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1942 | 21/03/1942 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/01/1943 | 27/02/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1944 | 02/12/1944 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/06/1946 | 10/08/1946 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3024 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1948 | 16/04/1948 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2965 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60821 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1950 | 24/03/1950 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 29546 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1950 | 28/11/1950 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1952 | 29/05/1952 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/02/1953 | 17/02/1953 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1954 | 23/03/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29375 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/10/1955 | 11/11/1955 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1956 | 15/03/1956 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/03/1956 | 27/03/1956 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/12/1957 | 08/02/1958 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29358 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1960 | 03/05/1960 | 30 days | General | Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/12/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4792 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1719 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
26/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/05/1938. Dep: 31/05/1938. | ||
06/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/03/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939. | ||
13/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1939. Dep: 24/06/1939. | ||
22/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/02/1940. Dep: 02/03/1940. | ||
26/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1941. Dep: 24/05/1941. | ||
29/11/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
07/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/03/1942. Dep: 21/03/1942. | ||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
30/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1943. Dep: 27/02/1943. | ||
28/11/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
28/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944. | ||
17/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 721 | ||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 821 | ||
22/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1946. Dep: 10/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3024 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1948. Dep: 16/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2965 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60821 |
||
24/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1950. Dep: 24/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29546 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/11/1950. Dep: 28/11/1950. | ||
22/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
28/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to To Scottish Region (91X) | ||
19/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
29/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/04/1952. Dep: 29/05/1952. | ||
25/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
11/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/02/1953. Dep: 17/02/1953. | ||
18/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1954. Dep: 23/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29375 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1955. Dep: 11/11/1955. | ||
13/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/03/1956. Dep: 15/03/1956. | ||
26/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/03/1956. Dep: 27/03/1956. | ||
29/07/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
11/08/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
30/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1957. Dep: 08/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29358 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
14/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
04/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1960. Dep: 03/05/1960. Work undertaken: Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
13/05/1960 | Modification | Diagram 109 number 29527 boiler fitted | ||
13/05/1960 | Modification | Diagram 109 number 3125 boiler fitted | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60821 from New England (34E) | ||
23/05/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |