Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 370 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3961 Week
» 14096 Month
» 330327 Year
» 841429 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4791   23/11/1937
LNER (1946 1st) 720   03/04/1946
LNER (1946 2nd) 820   11/05/1946
BR 60820   04/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Wed 23/11/1937 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Wed 20/06/1962 off New England (34E)
Scrapping Wed 20/06/1962 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 24 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys

Notes
Notes In for cutting up at Doncaster Works 20/6/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) 23/11/1937
KX Kings Cross 28/11/1943
WFD Woodford Halse 11/11/1948
35A New England 28/01/1951
38E Woodford Halse 08/02/1953
38C Leicester (G.C.) 17/05/1953
34A Kings Cross 10/06/1956
34E Neasden 24/06/1956
34A Kings Cross 19/05/1957
34E New England 20/09/1959
   Withdrawn 20/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC 35A New England m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 38C Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 34E Neasden 4w/e 21/07/1956
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 03/10/1959
WDN   20/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
23/11/1937 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2903)
11/07/1942 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 9238)
11/05/1946 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3022)
04/04/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3445)
14/04/1950 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 9545)
25/03/1952 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29401)
15/01/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29377)
24/12/1955 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29346)
24/12/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29354)
05/11/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
20/03/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 23/06/1938 24/06/1938 2 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 25/02/1939 08/04/1939 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/03/1940 30/03/1940 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 14/09/1940 26/10/1940 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/05/1942 11/07/1942 50 days General
Boiler number 29507 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 19/08/1944 23/09/1944 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 30/03/1946 11/05/1946 43 days General
Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 720
 
Doncaster Works 03/03/1948 04/04/1948 33 days General
Boiler number 3445 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60820
 
Doncaster Works 02/02/1950 14/04/1950 72 days General
Boiler number 9545 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 20/02/1952 25/03/1952 35 days General
Boiler number 29401 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 01/12/1953 15/01/1954 46 days General
Boiler number 29377 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 08/11/1955 24/12/1955 47 days General
Boiler number 29346 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 14/02/1956 02/03/1956 18 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 21/11/1957 24/12/1957 34 days General
Boiler number 29354 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 28/10/1958 05/11/1958 9 days Light Casual
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 18/03/1959 20/03/1959 3 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 16/11/1959 18/12/1959 33 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 12/09/1961 20/09/1961 9 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/11/1937 To Service To service as LNER Number 4791
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
23/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/06/1938. Dep: 24/06/1938.    
25/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1939. Dep: 08/04/1939.    
23/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/03/1940. Dep: 30/03/1940.    
14/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1940. Dep: 26/10/1940.    
23/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1942. Dep: 11/07/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29507 (Diagram 109)
   
28/11/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
19/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1944. Dep: 23/09/1944.    
30/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1946. Dep: 11/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 720
   
03/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1948. Dep: 04/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3445 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60820
   
11/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
02/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1950. Dep: 14/04/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9545 (Diagram 109)
   
28/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
20/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1952. Dep: 25/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29401 (Diagram 109)
   
08/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
17/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C)    
01/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1953. Dep: 15/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29377 (Diagram 109)
   
08/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1955. Dep: 24/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29346 (Diagram 109)
   
14/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/02/1956. Dep: 02/03/1956.    
10/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
24/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (34E)    
19/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
21/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1957. Dep: 24/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29354 (Diagram 109)
   
28/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/10/1958. Dep: 05/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
18/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/03/1959. Dep: 20/03/1959.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
20/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
16/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/11/1959. Dep: 18/12/1959.    
12/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/09/1961. Dep: 20/09/1961.    
20/06/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    
20/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 60820 from New England (34E)    

prev prev