|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 30/06/1938 | 09/07/1938 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1939 | 15/04/1939 | 54 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/11/1939 | 16/12/1939 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/03/1940 | 08/03/1940 | 1 day | Unclassified | Pony truck exam |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/07/1940 | 07/09/1940 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1940 | 18/09/1940 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1940 | 06/12/1940 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/10/1941 | 16/11/1941 | 39 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1943 | 19/06/1943 | 27 days | General | Darlington maintained from 1/8/43 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/08/1944 | 19/08/1944 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Inverurie Works | 30/08/1944 | 31/08/1944 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1945 | General | |||||
Cowlairs Works | 04/07/1946 | 06/07/1946 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1947 | 24/05/1947 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 29449 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1947 | 23/06/1947 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1948 | 25/06/1948 | 33 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 60816 |
||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1949 | 25/03/1949 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1951 | 26/02/1951 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29468 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1951 | 13/03/1951 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1952 | 20/12/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28051 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1954 | 24/12/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29547 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/09/1956 | 02/11/1956 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1958 | 12/09/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29438 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1961 | 08/06/1961 | 63 days | Heavy Intermediate | Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1962 | 08/05/1962 | 48 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1963 | 27/09/1963 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29470 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/10/1963 | 08/11/1963 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1963 | 14/12/1963 | 27 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
31/03/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. | SLS/194905 |
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/10/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4787 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1714 Allocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
30/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/06/1938. Dep: 09/07/1938. | ||
21/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1939. Dep: 15/04/1939. | ||
27/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/11/1939. Dep: 16/12/1939. | ||
03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
08/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/03/1940. Dep: 08/03/1940. Work undertaken: Pony truck exam |
||
29/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1940. Dep: 07/09/1940. | ||
16/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1940. Dep: 18/09/1940. | ||
14/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/11/1940. Dep: 06/12/1940. | ||
05/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
09/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1941. Dep: 16/11/1941. | ||
11/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
28/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
17/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
24/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1943. Dep: 19/06/1943. Work undertaken: Darlington maintained from 1/8/43 |
||
07/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
17/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/08/1944. Dep: 19/08/1944. | ||
30/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/08/1944. Dep: 31/08/1944. | ||
29/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
18/08/1945 | Modification | Diagram 109 number 29481 boiler fitted | ||
18/08/1945 | Modification | Diagram 109 number 2963 boiler fitted | ||
18/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Dep: 18/08/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 716 but not taken up | ||
04/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/07/1946. Dep: 06/07/1946. | ||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 816 | ||
14/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1947. Dep: 24/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29449 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/06/1947. Dep: 23/06/1947. | ||
24/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/05/1948. Dep: 25/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60816 |
||
23/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1949. Dep: 25/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1951. Dep: 26/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29468 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1951. Dep: 13/03/1951. | ||
19/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1952. Dep: 20/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28051 (Diagram 109) |
||
19/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1954. Dep: 24/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29547 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/09/1956. Dep: 02/11/1956. | ||
28/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
21/04/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
12/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1958. Dep: 12/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29438 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
07/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/04/1961. Dep: 08/06/1961. Work undertaken: Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
22/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/03/1962. Dep: 08/05/1962. | ||
19/08/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1963. Dep: 27/09/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29470 (Diagram 109) |
||
24/10/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/10/1963. Dep: 08/11/1963. | ||
18/11/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/11/1963. Dep: 14/12/1963. | ||
22/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60816 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
12/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |