|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 23/06/1938 | 27/06/1938 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1939 | 12/05/1939 | 60 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1940 | 09/02/1940 | 38 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1941 | 23/08/1941 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1943 | 11/06/1943 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1945 | 16/03/1945 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 3001 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/11/1946 | 07/12/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 9165 (Diagram 109) Smoke deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1947 | 06/02/1947 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/11/1948 | 17/12/1948 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3151 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60813 |
||
Darlington Works | 13/12/1949 | 16/01/1950 | 35 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 25/07/1950 | 25/08/1950 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3124 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1951 | 15/10/1951 | 15 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1952 | 27/09/1952 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 29549 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1952 | 30/09/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1954 | 23/02/1954 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/04/1954 | 15/05/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29519 (Diagram 109) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 26/04/1955 | 30/04/1955 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 26/10/1955 | 19/12/1955 | 55 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 07/08/1956 | 10/09/1956 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29345 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/10/1958 | 04/12/1958 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29399 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1958 | 17/12/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/10/1960 | 17/11/1960 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29435 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1963 | 23/08/1963 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 28068 (Diagram 109) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/1964 | 11/1964 | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | General | No. 10000, after a general overhaul at Doncaster, is now again painted blue with chromium lettering and figures. 'A.2' No. 518, Tehran, was almost ready at Christmas, and No. 519 will be a 1947 engine. It is reported - that 'V.2' No. 813 KX (late 4784) has been fitted with a stovepipe chimney surrounded by semi-circular smoke deflectors. | SLS/194702 |
15/06/1947 | General | 'V2' No. 813 is now fitted with small smoke deflectors on the chimney. | SLS/194708 |
05/05/1962 | Bathgate MPD | Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. | SLS/196206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/09/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4784 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1711 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
23/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/06/1938. Dep: 27/06/1938. | ||
14/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1939. Dep: 12/05/1939. | ||
09/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
03/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1940. Dep: 09/02/1940. | ||
04/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1941. Dep: 23/08/1941. | ||
12/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1943. Dep: 11/06/1943. | ||
03/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1945. Dep: 16/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3001 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 713 but not taken up | ||
18/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 813 | ||
02/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1946. Dep: 07/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9165 (Diagram 109) Smoke deflectors fitted |
||
05/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1947. Dep: 06/02/1947. | ||
13/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1948. Dep: 17/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3151 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60813 |
||
13/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/12/1949. Dep: 16/01/1950. | ||
25/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1950. Dep: 25/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3124 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
01/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/10/1951. Dep: 15/10/1951. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
04/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1952. Dep: 27/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29549 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/09/1952. Dep: 30/09/1952. | ||
25/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/01/1954. Dep: 23/02/1954. | ||
15/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1954. Dep: 15/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29519 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/04/1955. Dep: 30/04/1955. | ||
26/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/10/1955. Dep: 19/12/1955. | ||
07/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1956. Dep: 10/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29345 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1958. Dep: 04/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29399 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
11/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/12/1958. Dep: 17/12/1958. | ||
12/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1960. Dep: 17/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29435 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
25/06/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1963. Dep: 23/08/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28068 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/11/1964. Dep: ?/11/1964. | ||
24/04/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
26/09/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60813 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
11/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |