|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 26/03/1938 | 14/05/1938 | 50 days | General | Tablet exchange apparatus on by 1/37 |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1938 | 17/09/1938 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1939 | 29/06/1939 | 38 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/02/1940 | 22/02/1940 | 1 day | Light Repair | Pony truck exam |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/03/1941 | 07/05/1941 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1942 | 17/07/1942 | 37 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/03/1943 | 02/05/1943 | 34 days | General | Darlington maintained from 1/8/43 |
||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1944 | 02/12/1944 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/10/1946 | 30/11/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3000 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/02/1948 | 05/03/1948 | 28 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E804 |
||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1948 | 10/09/1948 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2994 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60804 |
||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1950 | 07/10/1950 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29446 (Diagram 109) |
||
Gateshead Works | 16/10/1950 | 18/10/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/10/1950 | 26/10/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1950 | 05/12/1950 | 29 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1952 | 11/10/1952 | 33 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 13/10/1952 | 14/10/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1954 | 09/10/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29472 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1954 | 22/10/1954 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1957 | 06/09/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29418 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1959 | 09/06/1959 | 30 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1959 | 28/10/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29347 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1962 | 18/05/1962 | 67 days | Heavy Intermediate | Smith speedometer fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Darlington Works | New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) | SLS/194804 |
03/10/1948 | Darlington Works | The first new 'A.1,' No. 60130, was on trial W/E 24/9 and No. 60131 during W/E 2/10, both are nameless. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 517, 2342/71, 3344, 5027/28, 5852/83, 7300/07, 8141, E8723, 9392, 9881, 61638, 63099, 69841 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60804, 60980, 62729/75, 63333/91, 65666/92, 65752, 68302/99, 68675, 68744, 69868 and 'Austerity' 77050. No. 9089 was broken up W/E 24/9. | SLS/194811 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Stripping Shop) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
18/01/1964 | Bedford MPD (Scrapped) | Since the change over from steam to diesel in August, 1963, this depot has had no regular allocation but from 18th January the official allocation (previously O/L) is D4135/6 an D5379/80/1/2/3. | SLS/196403 |
07/03/1964 | Inverurie Works (Scrapped) | Shopped: 44722, 61147, 64558/99, 65931, D3548, D6139/53. Scrapped: 60089/98, 60159/62, 60804/38, 64603, 64579, 90058. In shops: 45011, 44880, 45194, 65915, D5328. Being Cut Up: 61177. | SLS/196403 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/11/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4775 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1846 Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
26/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1938. Dep: 14/05/1938. Work undertaken: Tablet exchange apparatus on by 1/37 |
||
29/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/08/1938. Dep: 17/09/1938. | ||
23/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1939. Dep: 29/06/1939. | ||
22/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/02/1940. Dep: 22/02/1940. Work undertaken: Pony truck exam |
||
29/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1941. Dep: 07/05/1941. | ||
11/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/06/1942. Dep: 17/07/1942. | ||
30/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1943. Dep: 02/05/1943. Work undertaken: Darlington maintained from 1/8/43 |
||
02/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 704 but not taken up | ||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 804 | ||
26/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3000 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/02/1948. Dep: 05/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E804 |
||
06/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1948. Dep: 10/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2994 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60804 |
||
06/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1950. Dep: 07/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29446 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/10/1950. Dep: 18/10/1950. | ||
23/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/10/1950. Dep: 26/10/1950. | ||
07/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/11/1950. Dep: 05/12/1950. | ||
09/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/09/1952. Dep: 11/10/1952. | ||
13/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/10/1952. Dep: 14/10/1952. | ||
09/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1954. Dep: 09/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29472 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/10/1954. Dep: 22/10/1954. | ||
23/12/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
02/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
11/06/1957 | Report | Report: On June 11 "A3s" Nos. 60043/90 and 60100, all of Haymarket, were all seen on Leeds, together with "V2s" Nos. 60804 and 60937 of Dundee (Tay Bridge). No. 60937 appeared 100 min. late, piloted by standard Class "5" 4-6-0 No. 73166 (SOA), on the up "North Briton." (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957) | ||
06/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1957. Dep: 06/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29418 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/05/1959. Dep: 09/06/1959. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
23/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1959. Dep: 28/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29347 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
13/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/03/1962. Dep: 18/05/1962. Work undertaken: Smith speedometer fitted |
||
05/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60804 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
14/02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |