|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 02/11/1936 | 10/11/1936 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1936 | 03/12/1936 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/10/1937 | 24/12/1937 | 68 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1938 | 10/02/1939 | 64 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/02/1940 | 08/03/1940 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1940 | 30/04/1940 | 26 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1940 | 27/11/1940 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3001 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1942 | 26/08/1942 | 50 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1944 | 16/02/1944 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1944 | 22/09/1944 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3383 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1944 | 23/12/1944 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1945 | 27/10/1945 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/01/1947 | 15/03/1947 | 69 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1947 | 15/02/1947 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/12/1948 | 22/01/1949 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 3431 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60801 |
||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1950 | 08/12/1950 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 29463 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1950 | 20/12/1950 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/11/1951 | 08/12/1951 | 10 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1952 | 12/09/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29547 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1952 | 08/10/1952 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1954 | 11/06/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29534 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/10/1956 | 07/12/1956 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29507 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1958 | 04/09/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 17/11/1958 | 21/11/1958 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 19/05/1959 | 23/06/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29510 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1942 | L.N.E.R. Notes (March Area) | March Area.-'V.2's' appear quite often, the following having been noted in Oct./Nov.: 4772/96, 4813/7. 'J.17' 8195 has been fitted with carriage heating and vacuum brake. 2859 East Anglian was here 31/10/42 fresh from Plant. It has ordinary whistle. A 'Pacific' visits us regularly on Sundays, examples noted being 4472/4 an 2571. 'E.4's' 7408/16/66/92 an 7503 are stationed here for working on the Joint line to Spalding, &c.-the first ones shedded here for a long time. Our regular station pilot 8062 is often in shops and its place is taken by 'D.16' 8805 or by 'D.9' or 'J.15' classes. | SLS/194302 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/08/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4772 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1841 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
02/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/11/1936. Dep: 10/11/1936. | ||
21/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/11/1936. Dep: 03/12/1936. | ||
18/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1937. Dep: 24/12/1937. | ||
09/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1938. Dep: 10/02/1939. | ||
29/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/02/1940. Dep: 08/03/1940. | ||
05/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/04/1940. Dep: 30/04/1940. | ||
16/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1940. Dep: 27/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3001 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1942. Dep: 26/08/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
27/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/01/1944. Dep: 16/02/1944. | ||
29/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1944. Dep: 22/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3383 (Diagram 109) |
||
30/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/11/1944. Dep: 23/12/1944. | ||
29/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1945. Dep: 27/10/1945. | ||
18/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 701 | ||
19/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 801 | ||
06/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/01/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947. | ||
11/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1947. Dep: 15/02/1947. | ||
14/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1948. Dep: 22/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3431 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60801 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
16/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1950. Dep: 08/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29463 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/12/1950. Dep: 20/12/1950. | ||
29/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/11/1951. Dep: 08/12/1951. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
14/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1952. Dep: 12/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29547 (Diagram 109) |
||
17/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/09/1952. Dep: 08/10/1952. | ||
30/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
07/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
15/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
11/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1954. Dep: 11/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29534 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
23/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1956. Dep: 07/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29507 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/09/1958. Dep: 04/09/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
17/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/11/1958. Dep: 21/11/1958. | ||
19/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1959. Dep: 23/06/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29510 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
01/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60801 from Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
26/10/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |