Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1582 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19385 Week
» 72401 Month
» 191928 Year
» 3218781 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) |
488 |
on |
07/01/1939 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7677 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
67677 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
V1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Order Number |
345 |
Works Number |
1893 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake |
|
To Service |
Mon 07/01/1939 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 01/10/1962 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys |
Information |
Hopper bunker |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1954 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/08/1949 |
M. & G.N. R. Line |
On the Melton Constable-Cromer route the majority of trains are hauled by 'D.16' 4-4-0's, of which class eight examples were noted, apparently working out their time on far from onerous duties; while the heavier holiday trains at week-ends brought 'B.12' and 'B.17' 4-6-0's and 'K.2' and 'K.3' 2-6--0's. The ubiquitous 'B.1' class was in evidence, though usually on goods workings, and the same applies to the 'J.39' 0-6-0's. Ex-G.N, 0-6-0 No, 64249 ('J.6') and ex-G.E. 0-6-0's Nos. 5567 ('J.17') and 64653 ('J.19') were seen on passenger trains. Tank engines noted were Nos. 7664, 67677 an 67679 ('V.1') and No. 69679 ('N.7'), which were by no means hard pressed in handling two, three and four coach trains on this route, while occasionally an ex-G.E. 2-4-2T put in an appearance. Except for No. 61272 ('B.1') and No. 64249 ('J.6'), which were freshly painted in standard British Railways livery, the engines noted compared very unfavourably with those of earlier days in the matter of cleanliness. Most of the passenger trains were made up of corridor stock ranging from modern L.N.E. and L.M.S. vehicles to ex-E.C.J.S., G.E.. N.E. and N.B. coaches, with a considerable proportion of ex-L.N.W 'flat' roofed stock transferred to the M. & G.N. and now in former L.N.E. varnished teak livery. The average train set would get high marks for interest but little for uniformity. |
SLS/194910 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/01/1939 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 488 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7677 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67677 |
|
|
31/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
28/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
18/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) |
|
|
20/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) |
|
|
11/1954 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) |
|
|
21/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
01/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67677 |
|
|
11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|