Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 569 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18372 Week
» 71388 Month
» 190915 Year
» 3217768 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) |
469 |
m/e |
10/1938 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7671 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
67671 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
V1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Order Number |
344 |
Works Number |
1887 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake |
|
To Service |
During 10/1938 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 07/07/1960 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 9 mths , 7 dys |
Information |
Hopper bunker |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1954 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1938 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 469 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7671 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
22/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67671 |
|
|
12/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
23/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
03/1954 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
07/07/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67671 |
|
|
08/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|