Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1957 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19760 Week
» 72776 Month
» 192303 Year
» 3219156 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) |
420 |
m/e |
07/1938 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7664 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
67664 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
V1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Order Number |
344 |
Works Number |
1880 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 07/1938 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 5 mths , 29 dys |
Information |
Hopper bunker |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65A |
Eastfield |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
ALLOC |
91X |
To Scottish Region |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
ALLOC |
67B |
Hurlford |
4w/e |
07/04/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/08/1949 |
M. & G.N. R. Line |
On the Melton Constable-Cromer route the majority of trains are hauled by 'D.16' 4-4-0's, of which class eight examples were noted, apparently working out their time on far from onerous duties; while the heavier holiday trains at week-ends brought 'B.12' and 'B.17' 4-6-0's and 'K.2' and 'K.3' 2-6--0's. The ubiquitous 'B.1' class was in evidence, though usually on goods workings, and the same applies to the 'J.39' 0-6-0's. Ex-G.N, 0-6-0 No, 64249 ('J.6') and ex-G.E. 0-6-0's Nos. 5567 ('J.17') and 64653 ('J.19') were seen on passenger trains. Tank engines noted were Nos. 7664, 67677 an 67679 ('V.1') and No. 69679 ('N.7'), which were by no means hard pressed in handling two, three and four coach trains on this route, while occasionally an ex-G.E. 2-4-2T put in an appearance. Except for No. 61272 ('B.1') and No. 64249 ('J.6'), which were freshly painted in standard British Railways livery, the engines noted compared very unfavourably with those of earlier days in the matter of cleanliness. Most of the passenger trains were made up of corridor stock ranging from modern L.N.E. and L.M.S. vehicles to ex-E.C.J.S., G.E.. N.E. and N.B. coaches, with a considerable proportion of ex-L.N.W 'flat' roofed stock transferred to the M. & G.N. and now in former L.N.E. varnished teak livery. The average train set would get high marks for interest but little for uniformity. |
SLS/194910 |
14/04/1963 |
Hurlford MPD (in store) |
in store-40151, 40640/2/65, 44189/98/281, 42743, 45266, 57249/84/353/9, 55240, 67607/16/33/64/7, whilst ex LYR 52275 was en route Shieldhall. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1938 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 420 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7664 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67664 |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67664 |
|
|
10/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|