Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3906 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17312 Week
» 70328 Month
» 189855 Year
» 3216708 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (Orig) |
2928 |
m/e |
12/1934 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7628 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
67628 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
V1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Order Number |
324 |
Works Number |
1799 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1934 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 24/11/1964 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys |
Information |
Plain bunker |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65A |
Eastfield |
2w/e |
04/11/1961 |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
w/e |
08/12/1962 |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
7w/e |
29/12/1962 |
ALLOC |
52A |
Gateshead |
5w/e |
12/01/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/11/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2928 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7628 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67628 |
|
|
18/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
24/11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67628 |
|
|
02/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|