Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2305 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20108 Week
» 73124 Month
» 192651 Year
» 3219504 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1660 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9922 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
69922 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
T1 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-8-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1299 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 22/10/1956 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1956 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1932 |
Steam Reverse Fitted |
06/1943 |
Steam Reverse Removed |
12/1949 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 63C Boiler Fitted |
07/1952 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 63B Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1660 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1299 |
|
|
09/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Reverse Fitted |
|
|
06/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Reverse Removed |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9922 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 63C Boiler Fitted |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69922 |
|
|
07/1952 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 63B Boiler Fitted |
|
|
20/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B) |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
10/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
22/10/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69922 |
|
|