Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1037 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18840 Week
» 71856 Month
» 191383 Year
» 3218236 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1658 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9920 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
69920 |
m/e |
12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
T1 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-8-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1297 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/01/1959 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
54B |
Tyne Dock |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
12/01/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1933 |
Steam Reverse Fitted |
08/1943 |
Steam Reverse Removed |
05/1947 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 63B Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1658 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1297 |
|
|
10/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Reverse Fitted |
|
|
08/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Reverse Removed |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9920 |
|
|
05/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 63B Boiler Fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) |
|
|
12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69920 |
|
|
23/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) |
|
|
01/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
12/01/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69920 |
|
|