|
|
Where Repaired | Date Stopped | Days Since Last Stopped | Works Entry | Departure | Class of Repair | Waiting Repair Decision | Waiting Works | On Works | Total Duration | Cost of Repair | Mileage | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 27/04/1959 | n/a | 27/04/1959 | 27/05/1959 | Power Unit Engine change/piston seizure |
31 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 16/12/1959 | 203 days | 17/12/1959 | 13/01/1960 | Light Casual | 28 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 04/05/1960 | 112 days | 05/05/1960 | 21/06/1960 | Light Casual | 48 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 19/07/1960 | 28 days | 19/07/1960 | 22/07/1960 | Light Casual | 4 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 19/12/1960 | 150 days | 19/12/1960 | 27/01/1961 | Light Casual | 40 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 22/02/1961 | 26 days | 24/02/1961 | 23/03/1961 | Light Casual | 28 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 27/03/1961 | 4 days | 08/05/1961 | 06/06/1961 | Intermediate 154,181 miles |
30 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 21/06/1961 | 15 days | 10/07/1961 | 14/08/1961 | Light Casual | 36 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 13/01/1962 | 152 days | 18/01/1962 | 23/01/1962 | Light Casual | 6 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 17/02/1962 | 25 days | 22/02/1962 | 04/04/1962 | Light Casual | 42 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 24/05/1962 | 50 days | 28/05/1962 | 20/06/1962 | Heavy Casual | 24 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 27/08/1962 | 68 days | 30/08/1962 | 07/09/1962 | Heavy Casual | 9 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | 24/09/1963 | 382 days | 24/09/1963 | 04/10/1963 | Heavy Casual | 11 days | ||||||
Swindon Works | n/a | 26/07/1964 | Unknown Regime Seen in ‘A‘ shop - stil there on 27/9/64 |
|||||||||
Swindon Works | n/a | 04/12/1966 | 03/02/1967 | Unknown Regime | 62 days |
Start | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/11/1958 | To Service | To service as British Railways number D602, name: BULLDOG Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27662 Allocated to Laira (83D) |
||
27/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Power Unit) - Arr: 27/04/1959. Dep: 27/05/1959. Stopped on 27/04/1959 Work undertaken: Engine change/piston seizure |
||
17/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/12/1959. Dep: 13/01/1960. Stopped on 16/12/1959 |
||
05/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1960. Dep: 21/06/1960. Stopped on 04/05/1960 |
||
19/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/07/1960. Dep: 22/07/1960. Stopped on 19/07/1960 |
||
19/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1960. Dep: 27/01/1961. Stopped on 19/12/1960 |
||
24/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/02/1961. Dep: 23/03/1961. Stopped on 22/02/1961 |
||
08/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/05/1961. Dep: 06/06/1961. Stopped on 27/03/1961 Work undertaken: 154,181 miles |
||
10/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/07/1961. Dep: 14/08/1961. Stopped on 21/06/1961 |
||
18/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/01/1962. Dep: 23/01/1962. Stopped on 13/01/1962 |
||
22/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/02/1962. Dep: 04/04/1962. Stopped on 17/02/1962 |
||
28/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/05/1962. Dep: 20/06/1962. Stopped on 24/05/1962 |
||
30/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/08/1962. Dep: 07/09/1962. Stopped on 27/08/1962 |
||
24/09/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 24/09/1963. Dep: 04/10/1963. Stopped on 24/09/1963 |
||
26/07/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 26/07/1964. Work undertaken: Seen in ‘A‘ shop - stil there on 27/9/64 |
||
04/12/1966 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: 04/12/1966. Dep: 03/02/1967. | ||
31/08/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (84A) | ||
31/12/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 602 | ||
08/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |