|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1914 | 14/02/1914 | General | Boiler number 7202 (Diagram 4Sup) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1923 | 28/04/1923 | 111 days | General | Boiler number 1482 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/06/1925 | 03/10/1925 | 110 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3449 |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1928 | 05/04/1928 | 80 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1909 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 449 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1239 Allocated to Colwick (CLK) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 14/02/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7202 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
08/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1923. Dep: 28/04/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1482 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
16/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1925. Dep: 03/10/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3449 |
||
17/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1928. Dep: 05/04/1928. | ||
27/08/1930 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3449 from Colwick (CLK) |