|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1914 | 18/02/1914 | General | Boiler number 7200 (Diagram 4Sup) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1921 | 28/05/1921 | 79 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/11/1923 | 29/03/1924 | 122 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3446 |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/04/1926 | 21/08/1926 | 123 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1928 | 27/07/1928 | 144 days | General | Boiler number 8085 (Diagram 4Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1909 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 446 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1236 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1914. Dep: 18/02/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7200 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
11/03/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1921. Dep: 28/05/1921. | ||
29/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1923. Dep: 29/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3446 |
||
21/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1926. Dep: 21/08/1926. | ||
06/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1928. Dep: 27/07/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8085 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
16/09/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
27/02/1932 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3446 from Ardsley (ARD) |