Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2678 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 7831 Week
» 142647 Month
» 345311 Year
» 3372164 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
438 |
m/e |
08/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3438 |
|
31/10/1925 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
Q1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
233 |
Works Number |
1053 |
To Service |
During 08/1904 to Doncaster (DON) |
Withdrawal |
Fri 17/05/1929 off Ardsley (ARD) |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 9 mths , 16 dys |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Doncaster |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1904 |
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1550) |
24/03/1917 |
Diagram 4Sup boiler fitted (number 7349) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Doncaster Works |
|
1917 |
24/03/1917 |
|
General |
Boiler number 7349 (Diagram 4Sup)
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
30/08/1922 |
23/12/1922 |
116 days |
General |
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
15/07/1925 |
31/10/1925 |
109 days |
General |
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3438
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 438 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1053 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
|
|
1917 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: 24/03/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7349 (Diagram 4Sup)
|
|
|
30/08/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1922. Dep: 23/12/1922. |
|
|
15/07/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1925. Dep: 31/10/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3438
|
|
|
17/05/1929 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3438 from Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|