|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 12/1914 | General | Boiler number 1560 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||||
Doncaster Works | 12/1914 | General | Don. 6/5-6/8/27 G Boiler number 1560 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1921 | 17/12/1921 | 111 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/09/1924 | 13/12/1924 | 90 days | General | Boiler number 1543 (Diagram 4Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3437 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 437 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1052 Allocated to Colwick (CLK) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
12/1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/12/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1560 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
12/1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/12/1914. Work undertaken: Don. 6/5-6/8/27 G Boiler number 1560 (Diagram 4Sat) |
||
29/08/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1921. Dep: 17/12/1921. | ||
15/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1924. Dep: 13/12/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1543 (Diagram 4Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3437 |
||
01/03/1928 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3437 from Ardsley (ARD) |