Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 623 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14029 Week
» 67045 Month
» 186572 Year
» 3213425 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
423 |
m/e |
07/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3423 |
|
31/01/1925 |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Doncaster |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1903 |
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1538) |
11/1909 |
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1411) |
06/05/1915 |
Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted (number 1403) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 423 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1007 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1909 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/11/1909. |
|
|
11/1909 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Dep: ?/11/1909. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1411 (Diagram 4Sat)
|
|
|
1915 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: 06/05/1915. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1403 (Diagram 4Sat)
|
|
|
07/03/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1923. Dep: 16/06/1923. |
|
|
31/01/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3423 |
|
|
17/08/1925 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1925. Dep: 31/10/1925. |
|
|
27/06/1928 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3423 from Colwick (CLK) |
|
|