|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 1912 | 22/04/1912 | General | Rebuilt to Q2 Boiler number 7133 (Diagram 4Sup) |
|||
Doncaster Works | 30/08/1921 | 03/12/1921 | 96 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1924 | 25/10/1924 | 135 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1902 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 402 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 964 Allocated to Colwick (CLK) Diagram 4Sat boiler fitted |
||
1912 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: ?/1912. Dep: 22/04/1912. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to Q2 Boiler number 7133 (Diagram 4Sup) |
||
30/08/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1921. Dep: 03/12/1921. | ||
13/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1924. Dep: 25/10/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3402 |
||
13/09/1927 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3402 from Colwick (CLK) |