Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 850 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14256 Week
» 67272 Month
» 186799 Year
» 3213652 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Hull & Barnsley Railway |
129 |
m/e |
10/1907 |
North Eastern Railway |
3129 |
y/e |
1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2510 |
|
04/06/1924 |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Darlington |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1907 |
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number Q10_129) |
29/10/1927 |
Diagram Q10domed boiler fitted (number D1991) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
|
|
07/00/1922 |
02/1922 |
|
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
10/12/1924 |
29/04/1925 |
141 days |
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
04/08/1927 |
29/10/1927 |
87 days |
General |
Boiler number D1991 (Diagram Q10domed)
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 129 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 944 Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) Diagram Q10 boiler fitted |
|
|
1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3129 |
|
|
04/06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2510 |
|
|
10/12/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1924. Dep: 29/04/1925. |
|
|
04/08/1927 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1991 (Diagram Q10domed)
|
|
|
23/10/1929 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
02/01/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) |
|
|
30/07/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
06/08/1931 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2510 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|