Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 2852 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16258 Week
» 69274 Month
» 188801 Year
» 3215654 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Hull & Barnsley Railway |
127 |
m/e |
09/1907 |
North Eastern Railway |
3127 |
y/e |
1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2508 |
|
18/03/1924 |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Darlington |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1907 |
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number Q10_127) |
30/03/1927 |
Diagram Q10domed boiler fitted (number D1815) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
|
|
04/1922 |
04/1922 |
|
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
28/08/1923 |
21/12/1923 |
116 days |
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
08/12/1926 |
30/03/1927 |
113 days |
General |
Boiler number D1815 (Diagram Q10domed)
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
16/06/1930 |
17/09/1930 |
94 days |
General |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 127 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 942 Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) Diagram Q10 boiler fitted |
|
|
1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3127 |
|
|
28/08/1923 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1923. Dep: 21/12/1923. |
|
|
18/03/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2508 |
|
|
31/01/1925 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) |
|
|
08/12/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1926. Dep: 30/03/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1815 (Diagram Q10domed)
|
|
|
18/11/1929 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (SEL) |
|
|
16/06/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1930. Dep: 17/09/1930. |
|
|
02/01/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) |
|
|
14/09/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
23/10/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (SEL) |
|
|
30/10/1931 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2508 from Selby (SEL) |
|
|