Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 3987 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17393 Week
» 70409 Month
» 189936 Year
» 3216789 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Hull & Barnsley Railway |
126 |
m/e |
06/1907 |
North Eastern Railway |
3126 |
y/e |
1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2507 |
|
24/10/1924 |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Darlington |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1907 |
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number Q10_126) |
29/10/1924 |
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number D1670) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
|
|
10/1921 |
10/1921 |
|
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
13/11/1922 |
30/04/1923 |
169 days |
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
05/05/1924 |
29/10/1924 |
178 days |
General |
Boiler number D1670 (Diagram Q10) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 2507
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
23/06/1928 |
27/08/1928 |
66 days |
General |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 126 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 908 Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) Diagram Q10 boiler fitted |
|
|
1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3126 |
|
|
13/11/1922 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1922. Dep: 30/04/1923. |
|
|
05/05/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1924. Dep: 29/10/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1670 (Diagram Q10) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 2507
|
|
|
23/06/1928 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1928. Dep: 27/08/1928. |
|
|
18/11/1929 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (SEL) |
|
|
01/01/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
06/01/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) |
|
|
10/08/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (SEL) |
|
|
13/08/1931 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2507 from Selby (SEL) |
|
|