Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1959 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15365 Week
» 68381 Month
» 187908 Year
» 3214761 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Hull & Barnsley Railway |
117 |
m/e |
02/1907 |
North Eastern Railway |
3117 |
y/e |
1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2498 |
|
28/05/1924 |
Notes
Notes |
Cut up at Darlington |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
PTH |
Perth (LNER) |
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1907 |
Diagram Q10 boiler fitted (number Q10_117) |
28/09/1926 |
Diagram Q10domed boiler fitted (number D1809) |
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
|
|
01/1921 |
01/1921 |
|
General |
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
23/02/1924 |
28/05/1924 |
96 days |
General |
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 2498
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
27/05/1926 |
28/09/1926 |
125 days |
General |
Boiler number D1809 (Diagram Q10domed)
|
|
Darlington Works |
|
12/11/1930 |
09/01/1931 |
59 days |
General |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 117 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 899 Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) Diagram Q10 boiler fitted |
|
|
1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3117 |
|
|
23/02/1924 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 28/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 2498
|
|
|
27/05/1926 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1926. Dep: 28/09/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1809 (Diagram Q10domed)
|
|
|
12/11/1930 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1930. Dep: 09/01/1931. |
|
|
01/10/1931 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2498 from Hull Springhead (HLS) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth (LNER) (PTH) |
|
|