|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 02/07/1926 | 26/10/1926 | 117 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1929 | 20/08/1929 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 2263 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1933 | 10/10/1933 | 40 days | General | Boiler number D1243 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1936 | 07/02/1936 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/09/1936 | 28/10/1936 | 44 days | General | Boiler number D1513 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1939 | 30/06/1939 | 58 days | General | Boiler number D1573 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1941 | 06/09/1941 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2775 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1944 | 30/08/1944 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2778 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 13/02/1946 | 28/02/1946 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1947 | 16/08/1947 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 2718 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/01/1950 | 05/04/1950 | 91 days | General | Boiler number 24060 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to BR 63470 |
||
Gateshead Works | 29/04/1952 | 22/05/1952 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 23/12/1952 | 23/01/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24062 (Diagram 49) |
||
Gateshead Works | 07/10/1954 | 08/10/1954 | 2 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 18/10/1955 | 12/11/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24103 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/11/1955 | 15/11/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/01/1958 | 17/01/1958 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 12/01/1959 | 13/02/1959 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24035 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1961 | 07/03/1961 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1962 | 23/02/1962 | 33 days | General | Complete AWS fitted Boiler number 24059 (Diagram 49A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/04/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 630 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1230 Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
02/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1926. Dep: 26/10/1926. | ||
24/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
17/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1929. Dep: 20/08/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2263 (Diagram 49) |
||
27/11/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
01/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1933. Dep: 10/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1243 (Diagram 49) |
||
03/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1936. Dep: 07/02/1936. | ||
15/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1936. Dep: 28/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1513 (Diagram 49) |
||
04/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1939. Dep: 30/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1573 (Diagram 49) |
||
05/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1941. Dep: 06/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2775 (Diagram 49) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
02/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1944. Dep: 30/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2778 (Diagram 49) |
||
13/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/02/1946. Dep: 28/02/1946. | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3470 | ||
27/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1947. Dep: 16/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2718 (Diagram 49) |
||
05/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1950. Dep: 05/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24060 (Diagram 49) Renumbered to BR 63470 |
||
29/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/04/1952. Dep: 22/05/1952. | ||
23/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1952. Dep: 23/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24062 (Diagram 49) |
||
07/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/10/1954. Dep: 08/10/1954. | ||
18/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1955. Dep: 12/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24103 (Diagram 49A) |
||
14/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/11/1955. Dep: 15/11/1955. | ||
17/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
10/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/01/1958. Dep: 17/01/1958. | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) | ||
12/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1959. Dep: 13/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24035 (Diagram 49) |
||
10/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/02/1961. Dep: 07/03/1961. | ||
22/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1962. Dep: 23/02/1962. Work undertaken: Complete AWS fitted Boiler number 24059 (Diagram 49A) |
||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63470 from Tyne Dock (52H) |