|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 28/07/1923 | 14/08/1923 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 28/02/1925 | 19/05/1925 | 81 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 16/04/1928 | 18/06/1928 | 64 days | General | Boiler number E4/43 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 03/10/1930 | 14/11/1930 | 43 days | General | Boiler number E4/15 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/05/1934 | 16/06/1934 | 32 days | General | Boiler number D1967 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1938 | 13/05/1938 | 45 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/05/1938 | 27/05/1938 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/06/1941 | 19/07/1941 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2258 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/07/1941 | 26/07/1941 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/02/1943 | 26/03/1943 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/12/1943 | 08/01/1944 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2566 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/01/1947 | 08/03/1947 | 59 days | General | Boiler number HL111 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/08/1949 | 10/09/1949 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2570 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63457 |
||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1949 | 01/10/1949 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1949 | 07/10/1949 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/12/1952 | 24/12/1952 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 24245 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1955 | 25/06/1955 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 24237 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/06/1955 | 02/07/1955 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 29/04/1958 | 06/06/1958 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 24282 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1961 | 23/05/1961 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1961 | 30/11/1961 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2300 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 48 Allocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
28/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/07/1923. Dep: 14/08/1923. | ||
28/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1925. Dep: 19/05/1925. | ||
16/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1928. Dep: 18/06/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/43 (Diagram 50) |
||
03/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1930. Dep: 14/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/15 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1934. Dep: 16/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1967 (Diagram 50) |
||
30/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1938. Dep: 13/05/1938. | ||
14/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1938. Dep: 27/05/1938. | ||
29/03/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
09/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1941. Dep: 19/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2258 (Diagram 50) |
||
22/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/07/1941. Dep: 26/07/1941. | ||
27/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/02/1943. Dep: 26/03/1943. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
13/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1943. Dep: 08/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2566 (Diagram 50) |
||
29/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
05/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3457 | ||
09/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL111 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1949. Dep: 10/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2570 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63457 |
||
12/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/09/1949. Dep: 01/10/1949. | ||
03/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1949. Dep: 07/10/1949. | ||
02/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1952. Dep: 24/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24245 (Diagram 50) |
||
20/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1955. Dep: 25/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24237 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/06/1955. Dep: 02/07/1955. | ||
29/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1958. Dep: 06/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24282 (Diagram 50A) |
||
02/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/05/1961. Dep: 23/05/1961. | ||
30/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 30/11/1961. Dep: 30/11/1961. | ||
18/12/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63457 from West Hartlepool (51C) |