|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 03/07/1923 | 25/09/1923 | 85 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/02/1926 | 26/09/1926 | 231 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/01/1929 | 28/02/1929 | 32 days | General | Boiler number D182 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/07/1932 | 30/08/1932 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2441 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1934 | 17/11/1934 | 32 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/02/1937 | 20/03/1937 | 30 days | General | Boiler number D1568 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/07/1939 | 24/08/1939 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1941 | 17/05/1941 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2563 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/07/1943 | 04/09/1943 | 40 days | General | Boiler number HL112 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 15/11/1945 | 05/12/1945 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1947 | 19/06/1947 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2423 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 02/01/1949 | 13/01/1949 | 12 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63456 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1950 | 08/02/1950 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 4050 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/07/1952 | 23/08/1952 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 24283 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/01/1955 | 12/02/1955 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 14/02/1955 | 26/02/1955 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 29/08/1955 | 13/09/1955 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 20/01/1958 | 21/02/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24224 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 26/06/1958 | 10/07/1958 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1961 | 29/07/1961 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 24310 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1962 | 17/08/1962 | 40 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1963 | 04/02/1963 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/01/1964 | 17/01/1964 | 1 day | Weighing |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/07/1962 | Darlington Works (Sidings) | Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2299 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 47 Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
03/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1923. Dep: 25/09/1923. | ||
22/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
08/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1926. Dep: 26/09/1926. | ||
28/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1929. Dep: 28/02/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D182 (Diagram 50) |
||
21/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1932. Dep: 30/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2441 (Diagram 50) |
||
17/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1934. Dep: 17/11/1934. | ||
19/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1937. Dep: 20/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1568 (Diagram 50) |
||
12/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1939. Dep: 24/08/1939. | ||
21/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1941. Dep: 17/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2563 (Diagram 50) |
||
27/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL112 (Diagram 50) |
||
08/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
15/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/11/1945. Dep: 05/12/1945. | ||
22/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3456 | ||
06/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1947. Dep: 19/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2423 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
02/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/01/1949. Dep: 13/01/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63456 |
||
11/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1950. Dep: 08/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4050 (Diagram 50A) |
||
27/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
15/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1952. Dep: 23/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24283 (Diagram 50A) |
||
19/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/01/1955. Dep: 12/02/1955. | ||
14/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/02/1955. Dep: 26/02/1955. | ||
29/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/08/1955. Dep: 13/09/1955. | ||
20/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1958. Dep: 21/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24224 (Diagram 50A) |
||
26/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/06/1958. Dep: 10/07/1958. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
27/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (52K) | ||
12/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1961. Dep: 29/07/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24310 (Diagram 50A) |
||
06/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
09/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/07/1962. Dep: 17/08/1962. | ||
15/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/01/1963. Dep: 04/02/1963. | ||
17/01/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 17/01/1964. Dep: 17/01/1964. | ||
15/12/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63456 from Sunderland (52G) |