|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 11/06/1924 | 12/09/1924 | 94 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1927 | 29/06/1927 | 89 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/07/1927 | 29/07/1927 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1929 | 23/10/1929 | 52 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1931 | 28/01/1932 | 60 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1934 | 20/06/1934 | 30 days | General | Boiler number D916 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/08/1936 | 15/10/1936 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2819 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1938 | 08/11/1938 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/07/1939 | 17/08/1939 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/11/1939 | 14/12/1939 | 21 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1941 | 13/01/1942 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2976 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1944 | 06/04/1944 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2815 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 02/06/1945 | 18/06/1945 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 19/02/1946 | 16/03/1946 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2262 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3453 |
||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1948 | 07/04/1948 | 37 days | General | Boiler number HL110 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63453 |
||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1951 | 03/02/1951 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24172 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1953 | 21/02/1953 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1955 | 15/03/1955 | 44 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 13/12/1955 | 12/01/1956 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 11/06/1956 | 13/07/1956 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24275 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 26/02/1957 | 28/02/1957 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1959 | 06/03/1959 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/12/1959 | 01/01/1960 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24277 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1963 | 29/04/1963 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 24269 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1963 | 14/01/1964 | 30 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2296 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 44 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
11/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1924. Dep: 12/09/1924. | ||
02/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1927. Dep: 29/06/1927. | ||
25/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/07/1927. Dep: 29/07/1927. | ||
02/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1929. Dep: 23/10/1929. | ||
30/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1931. Dep: 28/01/1932. | ||
22/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1934. Dep: 20/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D916 (Diagram 50) |
||
27/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1936. Dep: 15/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2819 (Diagram 50) |
||
31/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/10/1938. Dep: 08/11/1938. | ||
08/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
12/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1939. Dep: 17/08/1939. | ||
24/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 24/11/1939. Dep: 14/12/1939. | ||
15/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1941. Dep: 13/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2976 (Diagram 50A) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
13/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1944. Dep: 06/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2815 (Diagram 50) |
||
02/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/06/1945. Dep: 18/06/1945. | ||
19/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1946. Dep: 16/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2262 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3453 |
||
02/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1948. Dep: 07/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL110 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63453 |
||
11/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
17/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
24/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
10/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1951. Dep: 03/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24172 (Diagram 50) |
||
17/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) | ||
23/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/01/1953. Dep: 21/02/1953. | ||
31/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/01/1955. Dep: 15/03/1955. | ||
13/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/12/1955. Dep: 12/01/1956. | ||
11/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1956. Dep: 13/07/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24275 (Diagram 50A) |
||
26/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/02/1957. Dep: 28/02/1957. | ||
01/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (54D) | ||
20/07/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
25/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
06/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/02/1959. Dep: 06/03/1959. | ||
02/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1959. Dep: 01/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24277 (Diagram 50A) |
||
24/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
25/03/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1963. Dep: 29/04/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24269 (Diagram 50A) |
||
16/12/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/12/1963. Dep: 14/01/1964. | ||
02/10/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63453 from Tyne Dock (52H) |