|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 21/08/1923 | 15/10/1923 | 56 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 18/03/1926 | 20/07/1926 | 125 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/02/1927 | 11/04/1927 | 68 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 02/07/1929 | 17/10/1929 | 108 days | General | Boiler number E4/10 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 21/11/1929 | 26/11/1929 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/06/1933 | 06/07/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number D940 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1938 | 24/02/1938 | 32 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1940 | 15/01/1941 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3159 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/05/1943 | 29/06/1943 | 42 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/05/1945 | 05/06/1945 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1947 | 23/05/1947 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 2259 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 30/09/1948 | 13/10/1948 | 14 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63450 |
||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1950 | 19/05/1950 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24251 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 25/11/1952 | 20/12/1952 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1953 | 24/10/1953 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1954 | 20/03/1954 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24184 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1954 | 25/03/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/04/1956 | 14/05/1956 | 27 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1958 | 22/12/1958 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 24164 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1959 | 12/01/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1963 | 13/02/1963 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24154 (Diagram 50A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1954 | Darlington Works | North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. | SLS/195404 |
03/12/1966 | Allocation of Q6 class (West Hartlepool) | Tyne Dock: 63344/66/81/7, 63413/20/6/9/31/55/8; Sunderland: 63346/95, 63405/36/7; West Hartlepool: 63368/94/7, 63407/40/50. | SLS/196701 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2293 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 41 Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
21/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1923. Dep: 15/10/1923. | ||
18/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1926. Dep: 20/07/1926. | ||
03/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1927. Dep: 11/04/1927. | ||
02/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1929. Dep: 17/10/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/10 (Diagram 50) |
||
21/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/11/1929. Dep: 26/11/1929. | ||
01/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1933. Dep: 06/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D940 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1938. Dep: 24/02/1938. | ||
16/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1940. Dep: 15/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3159 (Diagram 50A) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
19/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1943. Dep: 29/06/1943. | ||
12/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
10/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/05/1945. Dep: 05/06/1945. | ||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3450 | ||
27/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1947. Dep: 23/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2259 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
30/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/09/1948. Dep: 13/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63450 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
25/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1950. Dep: 19/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24251 (Diagram 50A) |
||
27/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
25/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/11/1952. Dep: 20/12/1952. | ||
22/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/09/1953. Dep: 24/10/1953. | ||
23/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1954. Dep: 20/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24184 (Diagram 50A) |
||
22/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/03/1954. Dep: 25/03/1954. | ||
18/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/04/1956. Dep: 14/05/1956. | ||
25/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1958. Dep: 22/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24164 (Diagram 50A) |
||
03/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/01/1959. Dep: 12/01/1959. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
08/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
14/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1963. Dep: 13/02/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24154 (Diagram 50A) |
||
31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63450 from West Hartlepool (51C) |