|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 20/08/1923 | 11/10/1923 | 53 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 16/11/1923 | 27/11/1923 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 28/10/1926 | 10/05/1927 | 195 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/09/1929 | 13/11/1929 | 58 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/04/1932 | 10/05/1932 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2429 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1935 | 16/04/1935 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/10/1937 | 30/11/1937 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 2567 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1941 | 11/02/1941 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2652 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/05/1943 | 15/06/1943 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2429 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/03/1946 | 03/05/1946 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 24204 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3448 |
||
Gateshead Works | 04/07/1948 | 13/07/1948 | 10 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63448 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1949 | 06/05/1949 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3023 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/05/1949 | 17/05/1949 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1950 | 10/03/1950 | 37 days | Light Casual | After derailment |
||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1952 | 01/02/1952 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24211 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1953 | 24/09/1953 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1954 | 09/09/1954 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 24278 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/09/1954 | 27/09/1954 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1956 | 05/01/1957 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24209 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/07/1959 | 28/08/1959 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24322 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/07/1961 | 09/11/1961 | 112 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/04/1962 | 17/05/1962 | 42 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/07/1961 | Darlington MPD (Waiting Works) | Waiting Works: D237, 60814, 61020, 63448, 67731/69, 78015, 90415. Ex-Works: 60872, 60928/42, 61273, 61303, 61448/64, 65801/93, 67636/90, 80099, 80100, 90465, 90710, 92147/92. | SLS/196108 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2291 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 39 Allocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
20/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1923. Dep: 11/10/1923. | ||
16/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/11/1923. Dep: 27/11/1923. | ||
28/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1926. Dep: 10/05/1927. | ||
17/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1929. Dep: 13/11/1929. | ||
07/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1932. Dep: 10/05/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2429 (Diagram 50) |
||
11/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1935. Dep: 16/04/1935. | ||
13/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1937. Dep: 30/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2567 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
02/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
25/05/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
07/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1941. Dep: 11/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2652 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
10/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1943. Dep: 15/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2429 (Diagram 50) |
||
26/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1946. Dep: 03/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24204 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3448 |
||
20/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
04/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/07/1948. Dep: 13/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63448 |
||
08/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1949. Dep: 06/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3023 (Diagram 50A) |
||
10/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/05/1949. Dep: 17/05/1949. | ||
04/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
10/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
24/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
26/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
02/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/02/1950. Dep: 10/03/1950. Work undertaken: After derailment |
||
08/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1952. Dep: 01/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24211 (Diagram 50A) |
||
11/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/09/1953. Dep: 24/09/1953. | ||
28/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1954. Dep: 09/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24278 (Diagram 50A) |
||
16/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1954. Dep: 27/09/1954. | ||
11/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1956. Dep: 05/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24209 (Diagram 50A) |
||
27/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1959. Dep: 28/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24322 (Diagram 50A) |
||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (52K) | ||
21/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/07/1961. Dep: 09/11/1961. | ||
06/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/04/1962. Dep: 17/05/1962. | ||
08/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63448 from Consett (52K) |