|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 15/02/1924 | 10/04/1924 | 56 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/03/1928 | 04/06/1928 | 69 days | General | Boiler number E4/32 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 16/12/1930 | 26/01/1931 | 42 days | General | Boiler number E4/21 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1934 | 23/02/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2570 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1937 | 08/06/1937 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1940 | 17/05/1940 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24163 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1941 | 15/07/1941 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1942 | 03/06/1942 | 35 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1944 | 08/07/1944 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2818 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1947 | 19/04/1947 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 2639 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/11/1948 | 09/12/1948 | 28 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63447 |
||
Darlington Works | 17/11/1949 | 12/12/1949 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24182 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 30/01/1951 | 23/02/1951 | 25 days | Light Intermediate | After derailment |
||
Gateshead Works | 14/02/1952 | 14/03/1952 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1952 | 28/04/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 25/08/1953 | 16/09/1953 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 24229 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 17/05/1954 | 26/06/1954 | 41 days | Heavy Casual | After derailment |
||
Gateshead Works | 29/06/1954 | 02/07/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/01/1955 | 09/02/1955 | 35 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 06/04/1956 | 22/05/1956 | 47 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1956 | 31/05/1956 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/04/1959 | 15/05/1959 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24280 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/10/1959 | 17/10/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1961 | 31/08/1961 | 22 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2290 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 38 Allocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
15/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1924. Dep: 10/04/1924. | ||
27/12/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
28/03/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
28/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1928. Dep: 04/06/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/32 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1930. Dep: 26/01/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/21 (Diagram 50) |
||
26/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1934. Dep: 23/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2570 (Diagram 50) |
||
29/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1937. Dep: 08/06/1937. | ||
22/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1940. Dep: 17/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24163 (Diagram 50A) |
||
23/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/06/1941. Dep: 15/07/1941. | ||
30/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1942. Dep: 03/06/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
14/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1944. Dep: 08/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2818 (Diagram 50) |
||
14/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3447 | ||
21/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1947. Dep: 19/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2639 (Diagram 50) |
||
12/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/11/1948. Dep: 09/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63447 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
17/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1949. Dep: 12/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24182 (Diagram 50A) |
||
30/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/01/1951. Dep: 23/02/1951. Work undertaken: After derailment |
||
14/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1952. Dep: 14/03/1952. | ||
28/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 28/04/1952. Dep: 28/04/1952. | ||
25/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1953. Dep: 16/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24229 (Diagram 50A) |
||
17/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 17/05/1954. Dep: 26/06/1954. Work undertaken: After derailment |
||
29/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/06/1954. Dep: 02/07/1954. | ||
06/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/01/1955. Dep: 09/02/1955. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
06/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/04/1956. Dep: 22/05/1956. | ||
28/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/05/1956. Dep: 31/05/1956. | ||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
14/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1959. Dep: 15/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24280 (Diagram 50A) |
||
12/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/10/1959. Dep: 17/10/1959. | ||
10/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/08/1961. Dep: 31/08/1961. | ||
29/04/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63447 from Thornaby (51L) |