|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 20/07/1923 | 11/09/1923 | 54 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 21/12/1925 | 08/03/1926 | 78 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/04/1926 | 09/06/1926 | 56 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 20/09/1928 | 05/11/1928 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 2149 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 16/08/1929 | 23/08/1929 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/09/1931 | 14/10/1931 | 35 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1935 | 24/08/1935 | 26 days | General | Boiler number AW28 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1935 | 22/10/1935 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1937 | 03/08/1937 | 99 days | General | Boiler number D930 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1939 | 27/09/1939 | 35 days | General | Boiler number AW13 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1940 | 30/03/1940 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1941 | 17/06/1941 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1941 | 12/11/1941 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1942 | 02/10/1942 | 32 days | General | Boiler number HL105 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/12/1944 | 13/01/1945 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2437 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1946 | 13/04/1946 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1947 | 29/03/1947 | 73 days | General | Boiler number 2566 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/05/1950 | 23/06/1950 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3847 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63445 |
||
Darlington Works | 26/06/1950 | 12/07/1950 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1953 | 28/02/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24186 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1953 | 03/03/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1955 | 24/09/1955 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24300 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1957 | 20/06/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 25/02/1958 | 03/04/1958 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24290 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/01/1960 | 08/01/1960 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1961 | 27/10/1961 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24169 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/01/1965 | 28/01/1965 | 1 day | Weighing |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2288 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 36 Allocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
20/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1923. Dep: 11/09/1923. | ||
21/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1925. Dep: 08/03/1926. | ||
15/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/04/1926. Dep: 09/06/1926. | ||
20/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1928. Dep: 05/11/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2149 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/08/1929. Dep: 23/08/1929. | ||
10/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1931. Dep: 14/10/1931. | ||
09/10/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
30/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1935. Dep: 24/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW28 (Diagram 50) |
||
23/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/09/1935. Dep: 22/10/1935. | ||
27/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1937. Dep: 03/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D930 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1939. Dep: 27/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW13 (Diagram 50) |
||
11/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/03/1940. Dep: 30/03/1940. | ||
06/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/06/1941. Dep: 17/06/1941. | ||
11/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/11/1941. Dep: 12/11/1941. | ||
01/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1942. Dep: 02/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL105 (Diagram 50) |
||
14/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1944. Dep: 13/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2437 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/04/1946. Dep: 13/04/1946. | ||
08/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3445 | ||
16/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1947. Dep: 29/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2566 (Diagram 50) |
||
30/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
17/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1950. Dep: 23/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3847 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63445 |
||
26/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/06/1950. Dep: 12/07/1950. | ||
30/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24186 (Diagram 50A) |
||
02/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1953. Dep: 03/03/1953. | ||
31/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1955. Dep: 24/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24300 (Diagram 50A) |
||
19/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/06/1957. Dep: 20/06/1957. | ||
25/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1958. Dep: 03/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24290 (Diagram 50A) |
||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
06/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/01/1960. Dep: 08/01/1960. | ||
02/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1961. Dep: 27/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24169 (Diagram 50A) |
||
16/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) | ||
13/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
28/01/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 28/01/1965. Dep: 28/01/1965. | ||
19/06/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
26/06/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63445 from Tyne Dock (52H) |